This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/24/2021 at 06:01:39 (UTC).

Kane v. de Blasio

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Kane filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against de Blasio. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2678

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Michael Kane

William Castro

Margaret Chu

Heather Clark

Stephanie Di Capua

Robert Gladding

Nwakaego Nwaifejokwu

Ingrid Romero

Trinidad Smith

Amaryllis Ruiz-Toro

Defendant / Appellees

Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of New York

David Chokshi, in his official capacity of Health Commissioner of the City of New York

New York City Department of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.

Attorney at The Gibson Law Firm, PLLC

407 North Cayuga Street

Ithaca, NY 14850

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Richard Paul Dearing Esq.

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Susan Paulson

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Devin Slack

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#108

(#108) ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant William Castro, Margaret Chu, Heather Clark, Stephanie Di Capua, Robert Gladding, Michael Kane, Nwakaego Nwaifejokwu, Ingrid Romero, Amaryllis Ruiz-Toro and Trinidad Smith, FILED. Service date 12/13/2021 by CM/ECF.[3227224] [21-2678] [Entered: 12/13/2021 02:52 PM]

107 #2

Supporting Document

107 #1

Judgment Mandate ISSUED

#106

(#106) ORDER, dated 11/30/2021, that the mandate issue forthwith. See FRAP 41(b) by DAL, ALK, ECL, FILED.[3220115] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/30/2021 04:30 PM]

#100

(#100) JUDGMENT, FILED.[3218345] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/28/2021 06:17 PM]

#98

(#98) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 11/28/2021, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[3218342] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/28/2021 05:21 PM]

97 #3

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_2

97 #2

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_1

97 #1

Per Curiam Opinion FILED

#11

(#12) ATTORNEY, Richard Paul Dearing for David Chokshi, Bill de Blasio and New York City Department of Education, in case 21-2678, [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3199560] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/26/2021 11:55 AM]

#8

(#10) ATTORNEY, Susan Paulson, [ # 8 ], in place of attorney Georgia Mary Pestana, SUBSTITUTED.[3199282] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:10 AM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#4

(#4) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/12/2021, RECEIVED.[3199061] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:42 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/06/2021, RECEIVED.[3199060] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:41 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/04/2021, RECEIVED.[3199059] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:40 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant William Castro, Margaret Chu, Heather Clark, Stephanie Di Capua, Robert Gladding, Michael Kane, Nwakaego Nwaifejokwu, Ingrid Romero, Amaryllis Ruiz-Toro and Trinidad Smith, FILED. Service date 12/13/2021 by CM/ECF.[3227224] [21-2678] [Entered: 12/13/2021 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[3220118] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/30/2021 04:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) ORDER, dated 11/30/2021, that the mandate issue forthwith. See FRAP 41(b) by DAL, ALK, ECL, FILED.[3220115] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/30/2021 04:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) JUDGMENT, FILED.[3218345] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/28/2021 06:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 11/28/2021, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[3218342] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/28/2021 05:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) OPINION, vacating the district courts order denying preliminary injunctive relief, per curiam by DAL, ALK, ECL, FILED.[3218338] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/28/2021 05:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 56 ], on behalf of Appellant William Castro, Margaret Chu, Heather Clark, Stephanie Di Capua, Robert Gladding, Michael Kane, Nwakaego Nwaifejokwu, Ingrid Romero, Amaryllis Ruiz-Toro and Trinidad Smith, FILED. Service date 11/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3217984][95] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/24/2021 12:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [ # 89 ], on behalf of Appellants William Castro, Margaret Chu, Heather Clark, Stephanie Di Capua, Robert Gladding, Michael Kane, Nwakaego Nwaifejokwu, Ingrid Romero, Amaryllis Ruiz-Toro and Trinidad Smith, FILED.[3217245] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant William Castro, Margaret Chu, Heather Clark, Stephanie Di Capua, Robert Gladding, Michael Kane, Nwakaego Nwaifejokwu, Ingrid Romero, Amaryllis Ruiz-Toro and Trinidad Smith, FILED. Service date 11/23/2021 by CM/ECF.[3217201] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [87], on behalf of Appellants William Castro, Margaret Chu, Heather Clark, Stephanie Di Capua, Robert Gladding, Michael Kane, Nwakaego Nwaifejokwu, Ingrid Romero, Amaryllis Ruiz-Toro and Trinidad Smith, FILED.[3216725] [21-2678] [Entered: 11/23/2021 09:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Richard Paul Dearing for David Chokshi, Bill de Blasio and New York City Department of Education, in case 21-2678, [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3199560] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/26/2021 11:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio, David Chokshi and New York City Department of Education, FILED. Service date 10/26/2021 by CM/ECF. [3199554] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/26/2021 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Susan Paulson, [ # 8 ], in place of attorney Georgia Mary Pestana, SUBSTITUTED.[3199282] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee David Chokshi, Bill de Blasio and New York City Department of Education, FILED. Service date 10/26/2021 by CM/ECF. [3199196] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/26/2021 07:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3199110] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/25/2021 05:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants William Castro, Margaret Chu, Heather Clark, Stephanie Di Capua, Robert Gladding, Michael Kane, Nwakaego Nwaifejokwu, Ingrid Romero, Amaryllis Ruiz-Toro and Trinidad Smith, district court receipt # ANYSDC-25239405, FILED.[3199065] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/12/2021, RECEIVED.[3199061] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/06/2021, RECEIVED.[3199060] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/04/2021, RECEIVED.[3199059] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants William Castro, Margaret Chu, Heather Clark, Stephanie Di Capua, Robert Gladding, Michael Kane, Nwakaego Nwaifejokwu, Ingrid Romero, Amaryllis Ruiz-Toro and Trinidad Smith, FILED. [3199053] [21-2678] [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New York City Department of Education is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Devin Slack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan Paulson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Paul Dearing Esq.