This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/11/2019 at 06:04:17 (UTC).

Kandance Wells v. Cumulus Media Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Kandance Wells filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Cumulus Media Corporation,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2978

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Cumulus Media Corporation

Access One Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

Kandance A. Wells

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kandance A. Wells

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Motion for Appointment of Counsel

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion & Affidavit for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis

Open Restricted Document #2

Envelope

Open Restricted Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Cover Letter

Open Document #2

Judgment: Judge Directed

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [4848033] [19-2978] (NDW) [Entered: 11/01/2019 09:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - Appeal is dismissed as untimely. ; Denying as moot [ # 4834723-2 ] motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Ms. Kandance A. Wells. STEVEN M. COLLOTON, RAYMOND W. GRUENDER and BOBBY E. SHEPHERD Adp Oct 2019 [4841245] [19-2978] (CRJ) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Ms. Kandance A. Wells w/service 09/25/2019. [4834723] [19-2978] (CMH) [Entered: 09/25/2019 03:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for appointment of counsel, filed by Appellant Ms. Kandance A. Wells w/service 09/25/2019. [4834719] [19-2978] (CMH) [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4830165] [19-2978] (CMH) [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 10/10/2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4830161] [19-2978] (CMH) [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 7/26/2019, Judgment dated 7/29/2019 and Order dated 9/12/2019. [4830160] [19-2978] (CMH) [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4830158] [19-2978]--[Edited 09/12/2019 by CMH. Corrected letter issued] (CMH) [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less