This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2021 at 05:33:55 (UTC).

Justin Peterson v. C.R. Bard, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Justin Peterson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35724

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

JUSTIN PETERSON

Defendant / Appellants

C.R. BARD, INC.

BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Laura Jean Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

Nadia H. Dahab

Attorney at Sugerman Law Office

707 Sw Washington Street, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97205

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Philip Marshall Busman Esquire

Attorney at Nelson Mullins

101 Constitution Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

Nancy Erfle

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

121 Sw Morrison Street

Portland, OR 97204

Richard B. North Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Atlantic Station

Atlanta, GA 30363-1700

Michael Kevin Brown

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

355 S Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kasey Curtis

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

355 S Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James Christopher Martin Esquire

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

225 Fifth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2716

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/03/2021. [12220168] [21-35724] (Martin, James) [Entered: 09/03/2021 01:15 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/03/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12220651]. [21-35724] (AD) [Entered: 09/03/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/03/2021. [12220168] [21-35724] (Martin, James) [Entered: 09/03/2021 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) James Christopher Martin, Kasey Curtis, Michael Kevin Brown for party(s) Appellant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. Appellant C.R. Bard, Inc., in case 21-35724. [12213804] (RR) [Entered: 08/27/2021 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James C. Martin (Reed Smith LLP 225 Fifth Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15222) for Appellants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.. Date of service: 08/27/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12213751] [21-35724] (Martin, James) [Entered: 08/27/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael K. Brown (Reed Smith, LLP 355 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2900 Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.. Date of service: 08/27/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12213741] [21-35724] (Brown, Michael) [Entered: 08/27/2021 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kasey J. Curtis (Reed Smith, LLP 355 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2900 Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellants C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. Date of service: 08/27/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12213733] [21-35724] (Curtis, Kasey) [Entered: 08/27/2021 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/03/2021. Transcript ordered by 09/27/2021. Transcript due 10/26/2021. Appellants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc. opening brief due 12/06/2021. Appellee Justin Peterson answering brief due 01/06/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12213658] (RT) [Entered: 08/27/2021 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Christopher Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kasey Curtis