This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/08/2021 at 06:07:34 (UTC).

Justin Abanukam v. Chad Kolitwenzew, et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 Justin Abanukam filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Chad Kolitwenzew,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2453

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

JUSTIN ABANUKAM

Kankakee, IL 60901-0000

Respondent / Appellees

DAMON ACUFF, Warden of Pulaski County Detention Center

MERRICK B. GARLAND, Attorney General of the United States

ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security

TAE D. JOHNSON, Acting Director, U.S. ICE

HENRY LUCERO, U.S. ICE Director, Chicago Field Office

CHAD KOLITWENZEW, Warden of Pulaski County Detention Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Justin Abanukam

Attorney at JEROME COMBS DETENTION CENTER

3050 S. Justice Way

Kankakee, IL 60901-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Julian Kurz

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 868

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#1

Federal Habeas Corpus Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: On August 17, 2021, the district court issued an order granting the petitioner leave to appeal in forma pauperis, but assessed a one-time payment of $48.01 toward the appellate docketing fee. The pro se appellant has not tendered the payment. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the pro se appellant SHOW CAUSE, by October 6, 2021, why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to tender the one-time payment. JR Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 3555. [9] [7187135] [21-2453] (AG) [Entered: 09/21/2021 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed notice of change of address for Justin Abanukam. [8] [7185589] [21-2453] (PS) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re: Respondent's notice of custody transfer and motion to sibstitute successor custodian. [ # 6 ] The motion to authorize the custody transfer is GRANTED. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 23(a), the transfer of Justin Abanukams to Jerome Combs Detention Center is approved. The motion to substitute the successor custodian is GRANTED. The clerks office shall substitute Chad Kolitwenzew, Abanukams new custodian, as the respondent- appellee. See FED. R. APP. P. 43. MEK [7] [7184929] [21-2453] (CG) [Entered: 09/10/2021 12:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion filed by Appellees Alejandro Mayorkas, Tae D. Johnson, Merrick B. Garland, Henry Lucero and Damon Acuff to authorize custody transfer and substitute successor custodian. [6] [7184711] [21-2453] (Kurz, Julian) [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Justin Abanukam. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7184067] [21-2453] (CM) [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Appellant Justin Abanukam is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Justin Abanukam by 09/08/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 4033. [4] [7181285] [21-2453] (AD) [Entered: 08/25/2021 09:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Justin Abanukam leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and assessed a $48.01 partial filing fee. (See order for further details). Date IFP granted: 08/17/2021. Partial fee due 09/01/2021. [3] [7179922] [21-2453] (MM) [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Appearance form filed by Attorney Julian Kurz for Appellees Damon Acuff, Merrick B. Garland, Tae D. Johnson, Henry Lucero and Alejandro Mayorkas. [2] [7178211] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-2453] [Edited 08/10/2021 by AG to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Kurz, Julian) [Entered: 08/10/2021 12:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Federal prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet due by 08/23/2021. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Justin Abanukam by 08/16/2021. [1] [7178112] [21-2453] (AD) [Entered: 08/10/2021 09:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julian Kurz