This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/29/2021 at 05:00:35 (UTC).

Juniper Networks, Inc.In re: Juniper Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Juniper Networks, Inc In re Juniper Networks, Inc was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-106

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In re: JUNIPER NETWORKS, INC.

Respondent

LONGHORN HD LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Alan M. Fisch

Adam Allgood

Matthew R. Benner

Jeffrey Matthew Saltman

R. William Sigler

Respondent Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Enrique William Iturralde

Peter Lambrianakos

Vincent J. Rubino III

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 10/25/2021. [808133] Entry of Appearance due 11/09/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/09/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:19 AM]

2 #1

Petition for Writ of Mandamus

#2

Appendix

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Alan M. Fisch; R. William Sigler; Jeffrey M. Saltman; Adam A. Allgood; Matthew R. Benner as counsel for Petitioner Juniper Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/26/2021 by email. [808217] [22-106] [R. Sigler] [Entered: 10/26/2021 11:37 AM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for Petitioner Juniper Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/26/2021 by email. [808219] [22-106] [R. Sigler] [Entered: 10/26/2021 11:45 AM]

#5

(#5) ORDER filed directing Longhorn HD LLC to respond to the petition [ # 2 ] no later than seven days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply in support of the petition is due no later than three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [808231] [LMS] [Entered: 10/26/2021 12:39 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Alfred R. Fabricant, Esq.; Peter Lambrianakos; Vincent J. Rubino, III; Enrique W. Iturralde as counsel for Respondent Longhorn HD LLC.. Service: 10/27/2021 by email. [808584] [22-106] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:07 PM]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for Respondent Longhorn HD LLC.. Service: 10/27/2021 by email. [808587] [22-106] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:09 PM]

8 #1

Motion

8 #2

supporting document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION of Respondent Longhorn HD LLC. to extend the time to 11/16/2021 to file brief. Service: 10/27/2021 by email. [808593] [22-106] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for Respondent Longhorn HD LLC.. Service: 10/27/2021 by email. [808587] [22-106] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Alfred R. Fabricant, Esq.; Peter Lambrianakos; Vincent J. Rubino, III; Enrique W. Iturralde as counsel for Respondent Longhorn HD LLC.. Service: 10/27/2021 by email. [808584] [22-106] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER filed directing Longhorn HD LLC to respond to the petition [ # 2 ] no later than seven days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply in support of the petition is due no later than three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [808231] [LMS] [Entered: 10/26/2021 12:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Petitioner Juniper Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/26/2021 by email. [808219] [22-106] [R. Sigler] [Entered: 10/26/2021 11:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Alan M. Fisch; R. William Sigler; Jeffrey M. Saltman; Adam A. Allgood; Matthew R. Benner as counsel for Petitioner Juniper Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/26/2021 by email. [808217] [22-106] [R. Sigler] [Entered: 10/26/2021 11:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner Juniper Networks, Inc. for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21. Service: 10/25/2021 by US mail, email. [808135] [KMH] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 10/25/2021. [808133] Entry of Appearance due 11/09/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/09/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less