This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/04/2022 at 06:09:06 (UTC).

Jump Buffalo Grove, LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Jump Buffalo Grove, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1006

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JUMP BUFFALO GROVE, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANIES

CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY

CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David G. Wix

Attorney at TARPEY WIX LLC

225 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Brian M. Reid

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

303 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Motion filed by Appellant Jump Buffalo Grove, LLC to extend time to file appellant brief. [2] [7214461] [22-1006] (Wix, David) [Entered: 01/31/2022 04:08 PM]

#3

(#3) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 2 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 03/07/2022 for Jump Buffalo Grove, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/06/2022 for Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company and The Cincinnati Insurance Companies. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/27/2022 for Appellant Jump Buffalo Grove, LLC. CMD [3] [7214564] [22-1006] (FP) [Entered: 02/01/2022 09:35 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 2 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 03/07/2022 for Jump Buffalo Grove, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/06/2022 for Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company and The Cincinnati Insurance Companies. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/27/2022 for Appellant Jump Buffalo Grove, LLC. CMD [3] [7214564] [22-1006] (FP) [Entered: 02/01/2022 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion filed by Appellant Jump Buffalo Grove, LLC to extend time to file appellant brief. [2] [7214461] [22-1006] (Wix, David) [Entered: 01/31/2022 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 01/18/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/14/2022 for Jump Buffalo Grove, LLC. [1] [7208593] [22-1006] (FP) [Entered: 01/04/2022 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cincinnati Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cincinnati Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant