This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 06:07:58 (UTC).

Julio Ramos v. Dominican Republic, et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Julio Ramos filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dominican Republic. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7045

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Eduardo Sulman, Consul General

Jose Tomas Perz, Hon., Ambassador

John and Jane Doe

Miguel Maldonaldo, Cansillier

Dominican Republic

Plaintiff / Appellant

Julio Ramos

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Julio Ramos

Attorney at Federal Correctional Institution

Po Box 38

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

Warden (Fort Dix)

Attorney at Federal Correctional Institution

Po Box 38

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

 

Court Documents

Open Document

RECEIPT [1796788] received from [signed for on 06/03/2019] for documents [ # 1788854-2 ] sent to Appellant Julio Ramos [Per Warden:Note from facitlity states Cannot serve inmate. Placed in Legal Mail to inmate 6/13/19.] [19-7045] [Entered: 07/11/2019 12:28 PM]

Open Document

LETTER [1788854] sent to warden sending Clerk order ifp motion or docket fee [ # 1788841-2 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/20/2019. [19-7045] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:31 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1788853] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/22/2019. APPENDIX due 07/22/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-7045] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:29 PM]

Open Document #5

Document Sent

Open Document #4

Form Sent

Open Document #3

Notice Sent

Open Document #2

Form Sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788836] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02669-UNA filed by Julio Ramos. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7045. [19-7045] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:02 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT [1796788] received from [signed for on 06/03/2019] for documents [ # 1788854-2 ] sent to Appellant Julio Ramos [Per Warden:Note from facitlity states Cannot serve inmate. Placed in Legal Mail to inmate 6/13/19.] [19-7045] [Entered: 07/11/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1788854] sent to warden sending Clerk order ifp motion or docket fee [ # 1788841-2 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/20/2019. [19-7045] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1788853] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/22/2019. APPENDIX due 07/22/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-7045] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1788841] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 06/20/2019; directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 06/20/2019. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 06/20/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-7045] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788836] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02669-UNA filed by Julio Ramos. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7045. [19-7045] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • PRIVATE PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-7045] [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.