This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:08:07 (UTC).

Julio Carabantes v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Julio Carabantes filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70378

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JULIO CESAR CARABANTES

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Alejandro Garcia

Attorney at Law Offices of Alejandro Garcia

6055 E. Washington Blvd.

Commerce, CA 90040

Respondent Attorney

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Petition for Review and Motion for Stay of Removal

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance (ECF Filing) [3] is rejected. Appearance filed for attorney not registered for electronic filing. Each attorney must register for e-filing and file their own notice of appearance. [11596731] (QDL) [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Katherine S. Fischer (Department Of Justice) for Respondent William P. Barr. Substitution for Attorney OIL for Respondent William P. Barr. Date of service: 02/13/2020. (Party was previously proceeding pro se.) [11596706] [20-70378] (Balaban, Kate) [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11595710]. [20-70378] (CD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. COUNSELED. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 03/18/2020. Response to motion for stay due 04/08/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Julio Cesar Carabantes. Respondent brief due 07/16/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11595256][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 02/13/2020 by BY] (JMR) [Entered: 02/12/2020 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.