This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/08/2019 at 06:04:50 (UTC).

Julie Whitchurch v. Elarbee Thompson Wilson & Sapp, et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Julie Whitchurch filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Elarbee Thompson Wilson Sapp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12621

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

READ GIGNILLIANT

ELARBEE THOMPSON WILSON & SAPP, LLP

DOUGLAS H. DUERR

RUSSELL VINEYARD

POOLE HUFFMAN, LLC

REBECCA SHEPHARD

VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

MATTHEW KEOWN

TODD J. POOLE

HARVEY BARTLE, III

M. BLACKWOOD

Plaintiff / Appellant

JULIE P. WHITCHURCH

Woodstock, GA 30189

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle

Attorney at Carlock Copeland & Stair, LLP

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 3600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Shannon M. Sprinkle

Attorney at Carlock Copeland & Stair, LLP

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 3600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Bradley N. Wood

Attorney at Carlock Copeland & Stair, LLP

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 3600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Gabriel Adam Mendel

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

75 Ted Turner Dr Sw Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Henry Lane Young II

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP

303 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Kathryn S. Whitlock

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP

303 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Stephen William Rothring

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP

303 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Bryan M. Grantham

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP

303 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Victoria Kealy

Attorney at The Shingler Law Firm, LLC

125 E Trinity Pl Ste 203

Decatur, GA 30030

Joyce Gist Lewis

Attorney at Krevolin & Horst, LLC

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 3250

Atlanta, GA 30309

Tianna Kalogerakis

Attorney at Kang Haggerty & Fetbroyt, LLC

123 S Broad St Ste 1670

Philadelphia, PA 19109

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Julie P. Whitchurch

103 Golden Hills Dr

Woodstock, GA 30189

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Julie P. Whitchurch has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:57 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss appeal as untimely filed by Poole Huffman, LLC and Todd J. Poole. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8867634-1] [19-12621] (ECF: Stephen Rothring) [Entered: 08/30/2019 01:56 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (missing page 2 of 8) filed by Appellant Julie P. Whitchurch. [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:06 PM]

Open Document

2nd NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Julie P. Whitchurch. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:07 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bradley N. Wood for Appellees Elarbee Thompson Wilson & Sapp, et al. Attorney Bradley N. Wood for Appellees Douglas H. Duerr and Read Gignilliant. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12621] (ECF: Bradley Wood) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:52 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kathryn Whitlock for Todd Poole and Poole Huffman, LLC Attorney Kathryn S. Whitlock for Appellee Poole Huffman, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12621] (ECF: Kathryn Whitlock) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:46 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Gabriel Adam Mendel for Appellees Harvey Bartle, III, M. Blackwood, Matthew Keown and Russell Vineyard. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12621] (ECF: Gabriel Mendel) [Entered: 08/07/2019 01:59 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen W. Rothring for Poole Huffman, LLC and Todd Poole [19-12621] (ECF: Kathryn Whitlock) [Entered: 07/31/2019 11:00 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kathryn S. Whitlock for Poole Huffman, LLC. [19-12621] (ECF: Kathryn Whitlock) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:46 PM]

Open Document #2

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document #1

ATTY-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gabriel Adam Mendel for Matthew Keown, M. Blackwood, Judge Harvey Battle, III, Judge Russell Vineyard [19-12621] (ECF: Gabriel Mendel) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:35 PM]

Open Document #2

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document #1

ATTY-1A Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bradley N. Wood for Elarbee Thompson Sappy & Wilson, LLP, Read Gignilliat, and Douglas Duerr [19-12621] (ECF: Shannon Sprinkle) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:08 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle for Douglas H. Duerr, Elarbee Thompson Wilson & Sapp, LLP and Read Gignilliant. [19-12621] (ECF: Shannon Sprinkle) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:57 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Julie P. Whitchurch. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/25/2019 08:31 AM]

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • MOTION MOOT: Motion to dismiss appeal as untimely is MOOT [ # 8867634-2 ] due to clerk's order filed 09/03/2019. Motion filed by Appellees Poole Huffman, LLC and Todd J. Poole. [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Julie P. Whitchurch has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss appeal as untimely filed by Poole Huffman, LLC and Todd J. Poole. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8867634-1] [19-12621] (ECF: Stephen Rothring) [Entered: 08/30/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (missing page 2 of 8) filed by Appellant Julie P. Whitchurch. [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 2nd NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Julie P. Whitchurch. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bradley N. Wood for Appellees Elarbee Thompson Wilson & Sapp, et al. Attorney Bradley N. Wood for Appellees Douglas H. Duerr and Read Gignilliant. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12621] (ECF: Bradley Wood) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kathryn Whitlock for Todd Poole and Poole Huffman, LLC Attorney Kathryn S. Whitlock for Appellee Poole Huffman, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12621] (ECF: Kathryn Whitlock) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Gabriel Adam Mendel for Appellees Harvey Bartle, III, M. Blackwood, Matthew Keown and Russell Vineyard. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12621] (ECF: Gabriel Mendel) [Entered: 08/07/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen W. Rothring for Poole Huffman, LLC and Todd Poole [19-12621] (ECF: Kathryn Whitlock) [Entered: 07/31/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kathryn S. Whitlock for Poole Huffman, LLC. [19-12621] (ECF: Kathryn Whitlock) [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, BRADLEY N. WOOD for Elarbee Thompson Wilson & Sapp, LLP, Read Gignilliant and Douglas H. Duerr is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and return the required application for admission. [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gabriel Adam Mendel for Matthew Keown, M. Blackwood, Judge Harvey Battle, III, Judge Russell Vineyard [19-12621] (ECF: Gabriel Mendel) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle for Elarbee Thompson Wilson & Sapp, LLP, Read Gignilliant and Douglas H. Duerr is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bradley N. Wood for Elarbee Thompson Sappy & Wilson, LLP, Read Gignilliat, and Douglas Duerr [19-12621] (ECF: Shannon Sprinkle) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle for Douglas H. Duerr, Elarbee Thompson Wilson & Sapp, LLP and Read Gignilliant. [19-12621] (ECF: Shannon Sprinkle) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Julie P. Whitchurch. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/25/2019 08:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Julie P. Whitchurch on 06/27/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/19/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/24/2019 as to Appellant Julie P. Whitchurch. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/07/2019 as to Appellee Elarbee Thompson Wilson & Sapp, LLP [Entered: 07/15/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vizant Technologies, LLC is a litigant