This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2021 at 06:10:48 (UTC).

Julie Beberman v. Antony Blinken

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Julie Beberman filed an Other lawsuit against Antony Blinken. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5140

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Antony J. Blinken, Secretary of State, in his official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellants

Julie A Beberman

Christiansted, VI 00822

Julie A. Beberman

Christiansted, VI 00822

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Christopher Hair

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Julie A. Beberman

Po Box 223029

Christiansted, VI 00822

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1910371] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1910026-2 ]; directing response to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1909387-2 ] Response due on 08/30/3021 [21-5140] [Entered: 08/16/2021 04:11 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1910026] to extend time to file response in opposition to motion for summary affirmance filed by Julie A. Beberman (Service Date: 08/12/2021 by US Mail) Length Certification: 2 pages. [21-5140] [Entered: 08/12/2021 01:03 PM]

Open Document #2

District Court Memorandum Opinion & Order

Open Document #1

Motion Filed

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1907272] filed by Antony J. Blinken [Service Date: 07/21/2021 ] [21-5140] (Hair, Christopher) [Entered: 07/21/2021 06:35 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1907271] filed by Christopher C. Hair and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee Antony J. Blinken. [21-5140] (Hair, Christopher) [Entered: 07/21/2021 06:34 PM]

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Underlying Decision in Case Filed

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1907370] filed by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:57 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1907368] filed by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:55 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1907367] filed by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ] [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:54 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1907361] filed by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ] [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:15 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1907359] filed by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ] [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:13 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1903394] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/06/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/22/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/22/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/22/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/06/2021. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [21-5140] [Entered: 06/22/2021 02:10 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1903387] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-00873-TJK filed by Julie A Beberman. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5140. [21-5140] [Entered: 06/22/2021 02:00 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1910371] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1910026-2 ]; directing response to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1909387-2 ] Response due on 08/30/3021 [21-5140] [Entered: 08/16/2021 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1910026] to extend time to file response in opposition to motion for summary affirmance filed by Julie A. Beberman (Service Date: 08/12/2021 by US Mail) Length Certification: 2 pages. [21-5140] [Entered: 08/12/2021 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1909387] for summary affirmance filed by Antony J. Blinken (Service Date: 08/06/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 2,978 Words.. [21-5140] (Hair, Christopher) [Entered: 08/06/2021 05:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1907272] filed by Antony J. Blinken [Service Date: 07/21/2021 ] [21-5140] (Hair, Christopher) [Entered: 07/21/2021 06:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1907271] filed by Christopher C. Hair and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee Antony J. Blinken. [21-5140] (Hair, Christopher) [Entered: 07/21/2021 06:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1907372] submitted by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ] [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1907370] filed by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1907368] filed by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1907367] filed by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ] [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1907361] filed by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ] [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1907359] filed by Julie A. Beberman [Service Date: 07/16/2021 ] [21-5140] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1903426] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 3141] of order [ # 1903394-6 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/22/2021 from Julie A Beberman. [21-5140] [Entered: 06/22/2021 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1903394] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/22/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/06/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/22/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/22/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/22/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/06/2021. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [21-5140] [Entered: 06/22/2021 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1903387] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-00873-TJK filed by Julie A Beberman. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5140. [21-5140] [Entered: 06/22/2021 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-5140] [Entered: 06/22/2021 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie Beberman Esq.