This case was last updated from PACER on 04/22/2019 at 16:20:00 (UTC).

Julian Owens v. University of South Carolina

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Julian Owens filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against University of South Carolina. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1183

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

HARRIS PASTIDES

HEATHER BRANDT

MICHAEL AMIRIDIS

KEN WATSON

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH CAROLINA

MURRAY MITCHELL

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION OFFICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION OFFICE OF POST-SECONDARY EDUCATION

KATRIN WASLSEMANN

SAMANTHA SHOFAR

ED FROGILLO

G. TOM CHANDLER

LACY FORD

CHERYL ADDY

RUTH SAUNDERS

LILLIAN SMITH

SOUTH CAROLINA INSURANCE RESERVE FUND

DAVID HENSEL

JIM THRASHER

Plaintiff / Appellant

JULIAN D. OWENS

Alexandria, VA 22312

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kelley S. Cannon

Attorney at HOWSER, NEWMAN & BESLEY, LLC

P. O. Box 12009

Columbia, SC 29211-0000

Jeffrey Ian Silverberg

Attorney at HOWSER, NEWMAN & BESLEY, LLC

P. O. Box 12009

Columbia, SC 29211-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Julian D. Owens

6023 Riddle Walk

Alexandria, VA 22312

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Additional Document

#2

(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 03/18/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. Mailed to: Julian Owens, Kelley Cannon, Jeffrey Silverberg.[19-1183] JSN [Entered: 02/20/2019 12:05 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER filed [1000476679] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 04/17/2019. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Julian Owens. [19-1183] JSN [Entered: 03/15/2019 04:01 PM]

#8

(#8) MOTION by Julian D. Owens for leave to file electronically. Date and method of service: 02/21/2019 US mail. [1000476684] [19-1183] JSN [Entered: 03/15/2019 04:03 PM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Murray Mitchell, Lillian Smith and Katrin Waslsemann. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000473145] [19-1183] Jeffrey Silverberg [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:10 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey I. Silverberg for Murray Mitchell, Lillian Smith and Katrin Waslsemann. [1000473117] [19-1183] Jeffrey Silverberg [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:48 AM]

10 #1

Informal opening brief (pro se cases, no paper copies required)

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00547-MGL. Case manager: JeffNeal. [19-1183] JSN [Entered: 02/20/2019 12:03 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER filed [1000476711] granting Motion for leave to file electronically. [ # 8 ] Copies to all parties.. [19-1183] JQ [Entered: 03/15/2019 04:33 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION by Julian D. Owens to extend filing time for informal opening brief. Date and method of service: 03/15/2019 hand delivery. [1000476675] [19-1183] JSN [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:59 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Julian D. Owens. [19-1183] Julian Owens [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER filed [1000476711] granting Motion for leave to file electronically. [ # 8 ] Copies to all parties.. [19-1183] JQ [Entered: 03/15/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION by Julian D. Owens for leave to file electronically. Date and method of service: 02/21/2019 US mail. [1000476684] [19-1183] JSN [Entered: 03/15/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER filed [1000476679] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 04/17/2019. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Julian Owens. [19-1183] JSN [Entered: 03/15/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Julian D. Owens to extend filing time for informal opening brief. Date and method of service: 03/15/2019 hand delivery. [1000476675] [19-1183] JSN [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Murray Mitchell, Lillian Smith and Katrin Waslsemann. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000473145] [19-1183] Jeffrey Silverberg [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey I. Silverberg for Murray Mitchell, Lillian Smith and Katrin Waslsemann. [1000473117] [19-1183] Jeffrey Silverberg [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#3) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00547-MGL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1183] JSN [Entered: 02/20/2019 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 03/18/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. Mailed to: Julian Owens, Kelley Cannon, Jeffrey Silverberg.[19-1183] JSN [Entered: 02/20/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00547-MGL. Case manager: JeffNeal. [19-1183] JSN [Entered: 02/20/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.