This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:44 (UTC).

Julian Arocho v. Secretary, Department of Corr., et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Julian Arocho filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corr . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12698

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF FLORIDA

SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Petitioner / Appellant

JULIAN AROCHO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

135 W Central Blvd Ste 1000

Orlando, FL 32801

Tonja Vickers Rook

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

3507 E Frontage Rd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Dane K. Chase

Attorney at Chase Law Firm, PA

111 2Nd Ave Ne, Ste 334

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dane K. Chase for Julian Arocho. [19-12698] (ECF: Dane Chase) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:38 AM]

Open Document #4

DC Opinion and Order Doc 17

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Dane K. Chase for Appellant Julian Arocho. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12698] (ECF: Dane Chase) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:40 AM]

Open Document #1

HAB-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Julian Arocho was filed on 07/17/2019. Docket Entry 23. [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:06 AM]

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 08/06/2019 11:55 AM]

Open Document #3

DC Judgment Doc 18

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Ashley Moody for Secretary, Department of Corrections and Attorney General, State of Florida and Tonja Vickers Rook for Secretary, Department of Corrections and Attorney General, State of Florida. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/20/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 08/06/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Dane K. Chase for Appellant Julian Arocho. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12698] (ECF: Dane Chase) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dane K. Chase for Julian Arocho. [19-12698] (ECF: Dane Chase) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Dane K. Chase for Julian Arocho. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Julian Arocho was filed on 07/17/2019. Docket Entry 23. [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Julian Arocho on 07/16/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 07/18/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.