This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/12/2022 at 06:06:24 (UTC).

Judith Shears v. Ethicon, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 Judith Shears filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1399

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Defendant

ETHICON, L.L.C.

Plaintiff / Appellants

JUDITH A. SHEARS

GARY F. SHEARS, JR.

Defendant / Appellees

ETHICON, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Charles Edward Amos II

Attorney at SEGAL LAW FIRM

810 Kanawha Boulevard, East

Charleston, WV 25301-0000

Jason Patrick Foster

Attorney at SEGAL LAW FIRM

810 Kanawha Boulevard, East

Charleston, WV 25301-0000

Jonathan R. Gdanski

1212 Southeast 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Jeffrey L. Haberman

1212 Southeast 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Charles Bland Patrick

1212 Southeast 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Sarah Schultz

1212 Southeast 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Scott Sumner Segal

Attorney at SEGAL LAW FIRM

810 Kanawha Boulevard, East

Charleston, WV 25301-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Natalie Rose Atkinson

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN, PLLC

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Amy M. Pepke

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

Crescent Center, 6075 Poplar Avenue

Memphis, TN 38119

Kimberly Gustafson Bueno

1400 Lavaca Street

Austin, TX 78701

Philip Combs

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Sarah A. Meadows

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Amy Pepke

Crescent Center, 6075 Poplar Avenue

Memphis, TN 38119

Susan M. Robinson Esq.

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Caroline D. Walker

1819 5Th Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00264-IMK. Case manager: REdwards. [1001145146] [22-1399] RE [Entered: 04/13/2022 11:23 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00264-IMK. Mailed to: C. Edward Amos, Kimberly Bueno, Jonathan Gdanski, Jeffrey Haberman, Sarah Meadows, Charles Patrick, Amy Pepke, Sarah Schultz and Caroline Walker. [1001145150] [22-1399] RE [Entered: 04/13/2022 11:25 AM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: C. Edward Amos, Kimberly Bueno, Jonathan Gdanski, Jeffrey Haberman, Sarah Meadows, Charles Patrick, Amy Pepke, Sarah Schultz, and Caroline Walker. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001145154] Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/23/2022. Response Brief due 06/22/2022 [22-1399] RE [Entered: 04/13/2022 11:28 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jason P. Foster for Gary F. Shears, Jr. and Judith A. Shears. [1001153148] [22-1399] Jason Foster [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:12 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott S. Segal for Gary F. Shears, Jr. and Judith A. Shears. [1001153151] [22-1399] Jason Foster [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:13 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by C. Edward Amos, II for Gary F. Shears, Jr. and Judith A. Shears. [1001153152] [22-1399] Jason Foster [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:14 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gary F. Shears, Jr. and Judith A. Shears. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001153154] [22-1399] Jason Foster [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:16 PM]

#8

(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Gary F. Shears, Jr. and Judith A. Shears.. [1001153156] [22-1399] Jason Foster [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:18 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Natalie Rose Atkinson for Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. [1001153382] [22-1399] Natalie Atkinson [Entered: 04/27/2022 04:22 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Amy M. Pepke for Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. [1001153387] [22-1399] Natalie Atkinson [Entered: 04/27/2022 04:25 PM]

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001153392] [22-1399] Natalie Atkinson [Entered: 04/27/2022 04:28 PM]

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001153397] [22-1399] Natalie Atkinson [Entered: 04/27/2022 04:30 PM]

#13

(#13) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001153691] [22-1399] MRB [Entered: 04/28/2022 10:06 AM]

#14

(#14) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 05/31/2022. Response brief due 06/30/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001159369] [22-1399] RE [Entered: 05/09/2022 04:30 PM]

#15

(#15) ORDER filed extending filing time for opening brief until July 5, 2022. Number of days granted: 35. Opening brief and appendix due 07/05/2022. Response brief due 08/04/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001162769] [22-1399] RE [Entered: 05/16/2022 11:45 AM]

#16

(#16) Mediation conference data modified. [1001163376] [22-1399] MRB [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:03 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Mediation conference data modified. [1001163376] [22-1399] MRB [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER filed extending filing time for opening brief until July 5, 2022. Number of days granted: 35. Opening brief and appendix due 07/05/2022. Response brief due 08/04/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001162769] [22-1399] RE [Entered: 05/16/2022 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 05/31/2022. Response brief due 06/30/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001159369] [22-1399] RE [Entered: 05/09/2022 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001153691] [22-1399] MRB [Entered: 04/28/2022 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001153397] [22-1399] Natalie Atkinson [Entered: 04/27/2022 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001153392] [22-1399] Natalie Atkinson [Entered: 04/27/2022 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Amy M. Pepke for Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. [1001153387] [22-1399] Natalie Atkinson [Entered: 04/27/2022 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Natalie Rose Atkinson for Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. [1001153382] [22-1399] Natalie Atkinson [Entered: 04/27/2022 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Gary F. Shears, Jr. and Judith A. Shears.. [1001153156] [22-1399] Jason Foster [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gary F. Shears, Jr. and Judith A. Shears. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001153154] [22-1399] Jason Foster [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by C. Edward Amos, II for Gary F. Shears, Jr. and Judith A. Shears. [1001153152] [22-1399] Jason Foster [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott S. Segal for Gary F. Shears, Jr. and Judith A. Shears. [1001153151] [22-1399] Jason Foster [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jason P. Foster for Gary F. Shears, Jr. and Judith A. Shears. [1001153148] [22-1399] Jason Foster [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: C. Edward Amos, Kimberly Bueno, Jonathan Gdanski, Jeffrey Haberman, Sarah Meadows, Charles Patrick, Amy Pepke, Sarah Schultz, and Caroline Walker. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001145154] Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/23/2022. Response Brief due 06/22/2022 [22-1399] RE [Entered: 04/13/2022 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00264-IMK. Mailed to: C. Edward Amos, Kimberly Bueno, Jonathan Gdanski, Jeffrey Haberman, Sarah Meadows, Charles Patrick, Amy Pepke, Sarah Schultz and Caroline Walker. [1001145150] [22-1399] RE [Entered: 04/13/2022 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00264-IMK. Case manager: REdwards. [1001145146] [22-1399] RE [Entered: 04/13/2022 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natalie Rose Atkinson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Gustafson Bueno