This case was last updated from PACER on 08/19/2019 at 06:05:38 (UTC).

Judith Alcocer v. Ashley Mills

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 Judith Alcocer filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Ashley Mills. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12360

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

ASHLEY MILLS, In her official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellee

JUDITH ALCOCER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Sean Kenneth Scally

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Richard K. Strickland

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Emily Rose Hancock

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Beverly A. Lucas

Attorney at Lucas & Leon, LLC

Po Box 752

Clarksville, GA 30523-0013

Homero Leon Jr.

Attorney at Leon & Kim, LLC

3006 Clairmont Rd

Atlanta, GA 30329

 

Court Documents

Open Document #4

Appellant's Appendix Volume IV

Open Document #3

Appellant's Appendix Volume III

Open Document #2

Appellant's Appendix Volume II

Open Document #1

Appellant Appendix Filed

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by Ashley Mills. [19-12360] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:35 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily R. Hancock for Ashley Mills [19-12360] (ECF: Emily Hancock) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:34 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Beverly A. Lucas for Appellee Judith Alcocer. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12360] (ECF: Beverly Lucas) [Entered: 07/09/2019 02:59 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Richard K. Strickland for Appellant Ashley Mills. [19-12360] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:17 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12360] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:16 AM]

Open Document #2

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document #1

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 06/19/2019 as to Appellant Ashley Mills. [Entered: 06/21/2019 11:00 AM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #131

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Ashley Mills. 4 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [4 VOLUMES] by Appellant Ashley Mills. [19-12360] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Ashley Mills. [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Ashley Mills. [19-12360] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily R. Hancock for Ashley Mills [19-12360] (ECF: Emily Hancock) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Beverly A. Lucas for Appellee Judith Alcocer. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12360] (ECF: Beverly Lucas) [Entered: 07/09/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Richard K. Strickland for Appellant Ashley Mills. [19-12360] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12360] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard K. Strickland for Ashley Mills. [19-12360] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 06/19/2019 as to Appellant Ashley Mills. [Entered: 06/21/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Ashley Mills on 06/19/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/30/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/05/2019 as to Appellant Ashley Mills. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/18/2019 as to Appellee Judith Alcocer [Entered: 06/21/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less