This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:27 (UTC).

Judah Hargrove v. Chae Harris

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Judah Hargrove filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Chae Harris. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3662

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

JUDAH HARGROVE

Lebanon, OH 45036-0056

Respondent / Appellee

CHAE HARRIS, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Judah Hargrove

Attorney at Lebanon Correction Institution

P.O. Box 56

Lebanon, OH 45036-0056

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

William H. Lamb

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

441 Vine Street, Suite 1600

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Appellant MOTION filed by Judah Hargrove to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 08/04/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:06 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Chae Harris by William H. Lamb. Certificate of Service: 07/15/2019. [19-3662] (WHL) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:28 PM]

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Appellant MOTION filed by Judah Hargrove to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 08/10/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:09 PM]

#1

(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Judah Hargrove. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:00 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Prisoner trust account statement filed. (ASM) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Financial Affidavit filed by Party Judah Hargrove Certificate of Service: 08/04/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Appellant MOTION filed by Judah Hargrove to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 08/04/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Appellant MOTION filed by Judah Hargrove to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 08/10/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Chae Harris by William H. Lamb. Certificate of Service: 07/15/2019. [19-3662] (WHL) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Judah Hargrove. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.