This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 05:34:32 (UTC).

Juana Nunez-Becerra v. William P. Barr

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Juana Nunez-Becerra filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against William P Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1315

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Juana Nunez-Becerra

Respondent

William P. Barr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Benjamin David Bergmann

Attorney at PARRISH & KRUIDENIER

2910 Grand Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50312

Respondent Attorneys

Richard Kelley

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Ben Franklin Station, P.O. Box 878

Washington, DC 20044-0878

Oil Oil

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 5Th Street

Washington, DC 20044

Carl H. McIntyre

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Ben Franklin Station, P.O. Box 878

Washington, DC 20044-0878

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Petition for Review

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #3

NOTICE Stay Removal

Open Restricted Document #1

Petition For Review Letter

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Richard J. Kelley for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr w/service 02/14/2020 [4881719] [20-1315] (RK) [Entered: 02/14/2020 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Administrative Record due 03/24/2020. Appendix due on 04/07/2020. Brief of Juana Nunez-Becerra due on 04/07/2020. Responsive brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief.[4881620] [20-1315] (CMH) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION for Review of an order of the Board of Immigration Appeals (Electronic) filed by Petitioner Ms. Juana Nunez-Becerra w/service 02/13/2020. [4881601] [20-1315] (CMH) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAgency case docketed. [4881599] [20-1315] (CMH) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.