This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/06/2022 at 09:28:59 (UTC).

Juan Martinez v. Los Angeles Police Department, et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 Juan Martinez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Los Angeles Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15509

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN

SAN JOAQUIN COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

CITY OF STOCKTON

STOCKTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

GREGORY LEE

RONALD ZALUNARDO

ERIC JACKMAN

Plaintiff / Appellant

JUAN FRANCISCO MARTINEZ

Defendant / Appellee

LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Donald W. Cook

Attorney at MANN & COOK

3435 Wilshire Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew McAleer Esquire

200 N. Main Street, 6Th Floor, City Hall East

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Jonathan H. Eisenman

Attorney at Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney

200 N Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Juan Francisco Martinez Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/20/2022. [12426409] [22-15509] (Cook, Donald) [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:28 AM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED - The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Juan Francisco Martinez opening brief due 07/06/2022. Appellee Los Angeles Police Department answering brief due 08/05/2022. Appellant optional reply brief is due within twenty one 21 days from the service date of the answer brief. See order for details. [12426953] (CL) [Entered: 04/20/2022 04:07 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/02/2022, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12426956] (CL) [Entered: 04/20/2022 04:10 PM]

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12462530] (CL) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:24 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12462530] (CL) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/02/2022, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12426956] (CL) [Entered: 04/20/2022 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED - The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Juan Francisco Martinez opening brief due 07/06/2022. Appellee Los Angeles Police Department answering brief due 08/05/2022. Appellant optional reply brief is due within twenty one 21 days from the service date of the answer brief. See order for details. [12426953] (CL) [Entered: 04/20/2022 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Matthew McAleer in 22-15509 substituted by Attorney Jonathan H Eisenman in 22-15509 [12426842] (DJV) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jonathan Eisenman (Los Angeles City Attorney's Office, 200 No. Spring Street, 14th Floor, City Hall, Los Angeles, CA 90012) for Appellee Los Angeles Police Department. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Matthew McAleer, Esquire for Appellee Los Angeles Police Department. Date of service: 04/20/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12426821] [22-15509] (Eisenman, Jonathan) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/20/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12426515]. [22-15509] (AD) [Entered: 04/20/2022 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Juan Francisco Martinez Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/20/2022. [12426409] [22-15509] (Cook, Donald) [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Juan Francisco Martinez Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/14/2022. Appellant Juan Francisco Martinez opening brief due 06/07/2022. Appellee Los Angeles Police Department answering brief due 07/07/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12415172] (RT) [Entered: 04/07/2022 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stockton Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where San Joaqun County Sheriff Department is a litigant

Latest cases where : LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT TASKFORCE FOR REGIONAL AUTOTHEFT PREVENTION is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant