This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:08:59 (UTC).

Juan Lopez v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Juan Lopez filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70386

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JUAN ANTONIO LOPEZ, AKA Posadas Lopez

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Douglas Jalaie Esquire

Attorney at The Law Office of Douglas Jalaie

P. O. Box 811518

Los Angeles, CA 90081

Respondent Attorney

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Petition With Stay Motion and BIA Decision

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #4

Counsel Case Information Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#3) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11595717]. [20-70386] (CD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Petitioner Juan Antonio Lopez motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/12/2020. [11595634] (HC) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. COUNSELED. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? YES. Certified Administrative Record due 03/18/2020. Response to motion for stay due 04/08/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Juan Antonio Lopez. Respondent brief due 07/16/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11595621] (HC) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.