This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:41 (UTC).

Juan Flagg v. Richard Brown

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Juan Flagg filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Richard Brown. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2347

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

JUAN FLAGG

Carlisle, IN 47838-0000

Respondent / Appellee

RICHARD BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Juan Flagg

Attorney at WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

P.O. Box 1111

Carlisle, IN 47838-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Jesse Drum

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Circuit Rules 3(c) and 28(a)

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

2 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

#1

State Habeas/Appealability Denied Case

4 #2

Exhibit A (Sealed)

7 #1

Order

4 #1

Motion (all other motions not listed below)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Appellant Juan Flagg is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Juan Flagg by 08/16/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1333 7838. [3] [7021303] [19-2347] (AD) [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:04 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Filed copy of Marion Superior Court, Criminal Division docket sheet by Appellant Juan Flagg. [6] [7026145] [19-2347] (PS) [Entered: 08/27/2019 10:04 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: On August 26, 2019, the pro se appellant filed a copy of a Marion Superior Court docket. The court will take no action on the filing. Further, the appellant is reminded that a Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement and a copy of a docket sheet are not the same thing. Accordingly, the appellant shall file the overdue docketing statement by September 13, 2019. The clerk shall send the appellant a copy of Circuit Rule 3(c) and Circuit Rule 28(a), so the appellant may familiarize himself with the information that must be included in a Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement, including the basis for federal jurisdiction, the date of the district court order being appealed, and the date the notice of appeal was filed. CMD [7] [7026260] [19-2347] (PS) [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed copy of Marion Superior Court, Criminal Division docket sheet by Appellant Juan Flagg. [6] [7026145] [19-2347] (PS) [Entered: 08/27/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Prose motion filed by Appellant Juan Flagg to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [7024559] [19-2347] (MM) [Entered: 08/20/2019 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Juan Flagg for appointment of counsel. [4] [7024557] [19-2347] (MM) [Entered: 08/20/2019 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Appellant Juan Flagg is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Juan Flagg by 08/16/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1333 7838. [3] [7021303] [19-2347] (AD) [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Juan Flagg leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 07/17/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 08/16/2019 for Appellant Juan Flagg [7017865] [2] [7017865] [19-2347] (VG) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 06/24/2019. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Juan Flagg by 07/22/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 07/30/2019. [1] [7017670] [19-2347] (MM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.