This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2019 at 06:01:05 (UTC).

JTH Tax, Incorporated v. Gregory Aime

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 JTH Tax, Incorporated filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gregory Aime. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1792

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

AIME CONSULTING, LLC

AIME CONSULTING, INC.

Defendant / Appellants

GREGORY AIME

WOLF VENTURES, INC., d/b/a Wolf Enterprises

Plaintiff / Appellees

JTH TAX, INCORPORATED, d/b/a Liberty Tax Service

SIEMPRETAX, + LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

David Caldwell Hartnett

Attorney at CRENSHAW WARE & MARTIN, PLC

150 West Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510-0000

William Ryan Snow

Attorney at CRENSHAW WARE & MARTIN, PLC

150 West Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Bradley David Masters

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY, LLP

725 12Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Sarah Anne Golabek-Goldman

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY, LLP

725 12Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Amy Mason Saharia

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY, LLP

725 12Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Gregory Aime and Wolf Ventures, Inc. Transcript needed: N Transcript already on file: Y Transcript order attached: N [19-1792] AW [Entered: 08/21/2019 08:33 AM]

#16

(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: JTH Tax Inc., Siempre Tax.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/07/2019. Opening/Response Brief Due: 11/05/2019. Response/Reply Brief Due 12/05/2019. [19-1746, 19-1792] AW [Entered: 08/27/2019 09:43 AM]

#14

(#7) Mediation conference data modified. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1746, 19-1792] MRB [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:32 AM]

Open Document

Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1746, 19-1792] MRB [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:52 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1746, 19-1792] MRB [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:38 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sarah Golabek-Goldman for JTH Tax, Incorporated and SiempreTax in 19-1746. [1000556826] [19-1746, 19-1792] Sarah Golabek-Goldman [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:41 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for JTH Tax, Incorporated and SiempreTax in 19-1746. [1000556803] [19-1746, 19-1792] Bradley Masters [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:29 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER filed [1000556654] consolidating case 19-1792 with 19-1746 (L). Cross-appeal appellant: JTH Tax, Incorporated and SiempreTax+ LLC. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Anna Mechling, Esq. [19-1746, 19-1792] AW [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:06 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:16-cv-00279-HCM-DEM. Mailed to: Anna Mechling, Esq. [19-1792] AW [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:59 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-00279-HCM-DEM. Case manager: AWalker. [19-1792] AW [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:49 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: JTH Tax Inc., Siempre Tax.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/07/2019. Opening/Response Brief Due: 11/05/2019. Response/Reply Brief Due 12/05/2019. [19-1746, 19-1792] AW [Entered: 08/27/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Gregory Aime and Wolf Ventures, Inc. Transcript needed: N Transcript already on file: Y Transcript order attached: N [19-1792] AW [Entered: 08/21/2019 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mediation conference data modified. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1746, 19-1792] MRB [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1746, 19-1792] MRB [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1746, 19-1792]--[Edited 08/05/2019 by ALC] MRB [Entered: 08/05/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1746, 19-1792] MRB [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sarah Golabek-Goldman for JTH Tax, Incorporated and SiempreTax in 19-1746. [1000556826] [19-1746, 19-1792] Sarah Golabek-Goldman [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for JTH Tax, Incorporated and SiempreTax in 19-1746. [1000556803] [19-1746, 19-1792] Bradley Masters [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER filed [1000556654] consolidating case 19-1792 with 19-1746 (L). Cross-appeal appellant: JTH Tax, Incorporated and SiempreTax+ LLC. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Anna Mechling, Esq. [19-1746, 19-1792] AW [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:16-cv-00279-HCM-DEM. Mailed to: Anna Mechling, Esq. [19-1792] AW [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-00279-HCM-DEM. Case manager: AWalker. [19-1792] AW [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.