This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/27/2019 at 06:06:29 (UTC).

JTF Rose, Inc. v. Raymond Esquerra

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 JTF Rose, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Raymond Esquerra. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1135

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

JTF ROSE, INC.

Debtor

In re: RAYMOND ESQUERRA

Appellee

RAYMOND ESQUERRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Michelle Ghidotti

Kristin A. Zilberstein

Appellee Attorney

David Brian Lally Esquire

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Notice of Referral

#2

3 #1

Opening Letter Schedule

3 #2

Briefing Order

#3

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

3 #4

E-Filing Administrative Order

3 #5

BAP Rules

3 #6

Corporate Parent Disclosure

#4

#5

#6

#7

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SMS) Motion is GRANTED extending time to file appellant's opening brief until 08/05/2019 Appellant JTF Rose, Inc.'s opening brief due 08/05/2019; dated: 07/15/2019. (CLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Attorney Kristin A. Zilberstein for Appellant JTF Rose, Inc.'s motion extending time to file appellant's opening brief until 08/05/2019; 07/13/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellants: Ghidotti, Zilberstein; Attorney for Appellee: Lally. [19-1135] (KAZ) [Entered: 07/13/2019 05:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of the certificate of readiness filed in Bk. Ct. 06/20/2019. (CLS) [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Attorney Kristin A. Zilberstein for Appellant JTF Rose, Inc.'s response opposing motion (to dismiss appeal).; served on 06/14/2019 email - Attorney for Appellants: Ghidotti, Zilberstein; Attorney for Appellee: Lally; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Lally. [19-1135] (KAZ) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant JTF Rose, Inc.. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant JTF Rose, Inc.'s opening brief due 07/15/2019. (CLS) [Entered: 05/29/2019 09:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. David Brian Lally, Esquire for Appellee Raymond Esquerra's motion to dismiss the case; 05/29/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellants: Ghidotti, Zilberstein; Attorney for Appellee: Lally. [19-1135] (DBL) [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 05/22/2019 and notice of referral. (CLS) [Entered: 05/28/2019 12:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less