This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/27/2019 at 06:06:26 (UTC).

JTF Rose, Inc. v. Raymond Esquerra

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 JTF Rose, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Raymond Esquerra. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1136

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

JTF ROSE, INC.

Debtor

In re: RAYMOND ESQUERRA

Appellee

RAYMOND ESQUERRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Michelle Ghidotti

Kristin A. Zilberstein

Appellee Attorney

David Brian Lally Esquire

 

Court Documents

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #5

Motion to Dismiss

3 #4

Motion to Dismiss

#3

Motion to Dismiss

3 #2

Motion to Dismiss

3 #1

Notice of Motion and Motion To Dismiss Appeal For Lack of Standing, and For Lack

2 #6

Corporate Parent Disclosure

2 #5

BAP Rules

2 #4

E-Filing Administrative Order

2 #3

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

#2

Briefing Order

2 #1

Opening Letter Schedule

1 #2

Notice of Referral

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Clerk's Order (Deputy Clerk: SMS) Motion is GRANTED extending time to file appellant's opening brief until 08/05/2019 Appellant JTF Rose, Inc.'s opening brief due 08/05/2019.;; dated: 07/15/2019. (CLS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Attorney Kristin A. Zilberstein for Appellant JTF Rose, Inc.'s motion extending time to file appellant's opening brief until 08/02/2019; 07/12/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellants: Ghidotti, Zilberstein; Attorney for Appellee: Lally; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Lally. [19-1136] (KAZ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of certificate of readiness filed in Bk. Ct. 06/20/2019. (CLS) [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Attorney Kristin A. Zilberstein for Appellant JTF Rose, Inc.'s response opposing motion (to dismiss appeal).; served on 06/14/2019 email - Attorney for Appellants: Ghidotti, Zilberstein; Attorney for Appellee: Lally; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Lally. [19-1136] (KAZ) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. David Brian Lally, Esquire for Appellee Raymond Esquerra's motion to dismiss the case; 05/31/2019 served by: email - Attorney for Appellants: Ghidotti, Zilberstein; Attorney for Appellee: Lally. [19-1136] (DBL) [Entered: 05/31/2019 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant JTF Rose, Inc.. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant JTF Rose, Inc.'s opening brief due 07/12/2019. (CLS) [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 05/22/2019 and notice of referral. (CLS) [Entered: 05/28/2019 10:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less