This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/12/2021 at 06:25:11 (UTC).

J.T. v. de Blasio

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 J T filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against de Blasio. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-4128

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

Warner Unified School District

Cobb County School District

Fulton County School District

Minnesota State Department of Education

Washington State School for the Deaf

Solana Beach Elementary School District

McCabe Union School District

Atlanta Independent School System

Valley Center-Pauma Unified School District

Town of Plymouth and Plymouth Board of Education

Certain School Districts Located in the State of Virginia

Lakeside Joint School District

Jamul-Dulzura Union School District

Pennsylvania Department of Education

Washington State School for the Blind

San Pasqual Union Elementary School District

Town of Stratford Board of Education

Town of Groton and Groton Board of Education

Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of New York City

Plaintiff / Appellant

C.N., individually and on behalf of V.N. and all others similarly situated

64 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sherry H. Culves Esq.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

201 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

James Edward Johnson Esq.

Attorney at Corporation Counsel of the City of New York

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Eric A. Mentzer

Attorney at Washington State Office of the Attorney General

7141 Cleanwater Lane, Sw, P.O. Box 40111

Olympia, WA 98504

Michael J. Scarinci Esq.

Attorney at Pennsylvania Office of the Attorney General

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Ryan Patrick Driscoll Esq.

Attorney at Berchem, Moses & Devlin, P.C.

75 Broad Street

Milford, CT 06460

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Peter Glenn Albert Esq.

Attorney at Brain Injury Rights Group

300 East 95Th Street

New York, NY 10128

Other Attorneys

Darren P. Cunningham Esq.

Attorney at Connecticut Office of the Attorney General

165 Capitol Avenue

Hartford, CT 06106

Barbara D. Underwood

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Fredric Paul Gallin Esq.

Attorney at Methfessel & Werbel, P.C.

112 West 34Th Street

New York, NY 10120

Mohammad Shihabi Esq.

Attorney at FordHarrison LLP

366 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Adam I. Kleinberg

Attorney at Sokoloff Stern LLP

179 Westbury Avenue

Carle Place, NY 11514

Bryan L. LeClerc Esq.

Attorney at Berchem, Moses & Devlin, P.C.

75 Broad Street

Milford, CT 06460

Caroline B. Lineen Esq.

Attorney at Silverman & Associates

445 Hamilton Avenue

White Plains, NY 10601

Dennis Michael Rothman Esq.

Attorney at Lester Schwab Katz & Dwyer, LLP

100 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

Kyle Kaiser Esq.

Attorney at Utah Office of the Attorney General

160 East 300 South

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jill M. O'Toole Esq.

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin LLP

1 Constitution Plaza

Hartford, CT 06103

Jacqueline Wilson Esq.

Attorney at Louisiana Department of Justice

1885 North 3Rd Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Joseph Kevin Scully Esq.

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Lewis R. Silverman

Attorney at Silverman & Associates

445 Hamilton Avenue

White Plains, NY 10601

Beth L. Kaufman Esq.

Attorney at Schoeman Updike Kaufman & Gerber LLP

551 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10176

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#128

#125

#123

#122

#116

#115

#113

#112

#108

#105

#100

#99

#98

#97

#96

#92

#89

#88

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant C.N., J.J. and K.M. Brief due date as 03/30/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 03/30/2021, FILED.[3029775] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/04/2021 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J. and K.M., informing Court of proposed due date 03/30/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 02/03/2021 by CM/ECF.[3029321] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[3028737] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Certain School Districts Located in the State of California, Certain School Districts Located in the State of Virginia, Cherry Hill Public Schools, Middletown Township Public Schools, Readington Township Public Schools and West Orange Public Schools, FILED. Service date 02/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3028298] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/02/2021 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) ATTORNEY, R. July Simpson for State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind, and Washington State School for the Deaf, in case 20-4128, [ # 116 ], ADDED.[3027002] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 116 ], on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED.[3026997] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 113 ], on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED.[3026994] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Washington State School for the Deaf, Washington State School for the Blind and State of Washington, FILED. Service date 02/01/2021 by CM/ECF. [3026910] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [114], on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED.[3026325] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/01/2021 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docket(#114) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF.[3026066] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Richard Carranza, Bill de Blasio and New York City Department of Education, FILED. Service date 12/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2997806] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2995514] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/17/2020 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Departments of Education in the United States, FILED. Service date 12/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2995506] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/17/2020 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY, Jacqueline Wilson, for Appellee School Districts in the United States, TERMINATED.[2995428] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/17/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER, dated 12/16/2020, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, Attorney Jacqueline Wilson informing she will not be participating on this appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 12/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2995424] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/17/2020 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#7) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Fredric Paul Gallin, Esq. for Appellee School Districts in the United States, Kyle Kaiser, Esq. for Appellee School Districts in the United States and State Departments of Education in the United States, Bryan L. LeClerc, Esq. for Appellee School Districts in the United States and Jacqueline Wilson, Esq. for Appellee School Districts in the United States, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2994963] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/16/2020 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2993811] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J., J.T. and K.M., district court receipt # ANYSDC-23000056, FILED.[2993807] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 11/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2993802] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J., J.T. and K.M., FILED. [2993789] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lakeside Joint School District is a litigant

Latest cases where Atlanta Independent School System is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant