This case was last updated from PACER on 02/28/2020 at 06:03:09 (UTC).

Joshua Young v. City of Chicago, et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 Joshua Young filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3534

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

N. WARNER, Star #17170

A. PAVONE, Star #13569

CITY OF CHICAGO

R. PERIANO, Star #15396

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOSHUA YOUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Larry S. Kowalczyk

Attorney at QUERREY & HARROW

175 W. Jackson Boulevard

Chicago, IL 60604-2827

Myriam Z. Kasper

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CORPORATION COUNSEL

30 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60602-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Marko Andrew Duric

Attorney at ROBERTSON DURIC

One North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60602

Robert J. Robertson

One N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60602-0000

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief [ # 9 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 03/25/2020 for Joshua Young. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/24/2020 for City of Chicago, A. Pavone, R. Periano and N. Warner. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/15/2020 for Appellant Joshua Young CMD [10] [7064396] [19-3534] (AP) [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:04 PM]

#9

(#9) Motion filed by Appellant Joshua Young to extend time to file appellant brief. [9] [7064296] [19-3534] (Duric, Marko) [Entered: 02/24/2020 01:06 PM]

#8

(#8) Added Attorney(s) Robert J. Robertson for party(s) Appellant Joshua Young, in case 19-3534 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert Robertson for Appellant Joshua Young. [8] [7064282] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3534]--[Edited 02/24/2020 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Robertson, Robert) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:23 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Joshua Young. [7] [7055867] [19-3534] (Duric, Marko) [Entered: 01/13/2020 07:57 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/24/2020 for Joshua Young. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/24/2020 for City of Chicago, A. Pavone, R. Periano and N. Warner. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/14/2020 for Appellant Joshua Young JB [7055041] [19-3534] (AP) [Entered: 01/09/2020 11:51 AM]

#5

(#5) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, January 23, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [5] [7055040] [19-3534] (AP) [Entered: 01/09/2020 11:49 AM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Joshua Young. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7053633] [19-3534] (Duric, Marko) [Entered: 01/03/2020 11:30 AM]

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Marko Duric for Appellant Joshua Young. [3] [7053599] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3534] (Duric, Marko) [Entered: 01/03/2020 10:35 AM]

#2

(#2) Appearance form filed by Attorney MYRIAM ZRECZNY KASPER for Appellees City of Chicago, A. Pavone, R. Periano and N. Warner. [2] [7053489] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-3534]-[Edited 01/02/2020 by VG - to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Kasper, Myriam) [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:08 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief [ # 9 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 03/25/2020 for Joshua Young. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/24/2020 for City of Chicago, A. Pavone, R. Periano and N. Warner. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/15/2020 for Appellant Joshua Young CMD [10] [7064396] [19-3534] (AP) [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion filed by Appellant Joshua Young to extend time to file appellant brief. [9] [7064296] [19-3534] (Duric, Marko) [Entered: 02/24/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Robert J. Robertson for party(s) Appellant Joshua Young, in case 19-3534 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert Robertson for Appellant Joshua Young. [8] [7064282] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3534]--[Edited 02/24/2020 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Robertson, Robert) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Joshua Young. [7] [7055867] [19-3534] (Duric, Marko) [Entered: 01/13/2020 07:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/24/2020 for Joshua Young. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/24/2020 for City of Chicago, A. Pavone, R. Periano and N. Warner. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/14/2020 for Appellant Joshua Young JB [7055041] [19-3534] (AP) [Entered: 01/09/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, January 23, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [5] [7055040] [19-3534] (AP) [Entered: 01/09/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Joshua Young. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7053633] [19-3534] (Duric, Marko) [Entered: 01/03/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Marko Duric for Appellant Joshua Young. [3] [7053599] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3534] (Duric, Marko) [Entered: 01/03/2020 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Appearance form filed by Attorney MYRIAM ZRECZNY KASPER for Appellees City of Chicago, A. Pavone, R. Periano and N. Warner. [2] [7053489] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-3534]-[Edited 01/02/2020 by VG - to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Kasper, Myriam) [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Joshua Young by 01/03/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 01/13/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/10/2020 for Joshua Young [1] [7052872] [19-3534] (AP) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less