Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2021 at 06:03:39 (UTC).

Joshua Tarter v. Navigators Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 Joshua Tarter filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Navigators Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5129

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOSHUA DONALD TARTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lynsie T. Gaddis

Attorney at Wilson Elser

100 Mallard Creek Road, Suite 250

Louisville, KY 40207

Richard Winston Boone Jr.

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker

150 E. 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017-5639

Aaron Bayer

Attorney at Wiggin and Dana

20 Church Street, 16Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Lynsie Gaddis Rust

Attorney at Wilson Elser

100 Mallard Creek Road, Suite 250

Louisville, KY 40207

David Scott Sheiffer

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker

150 E. 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017-5639

Jonathan Freiman

Attorney at Wiggin and Dana

265 Church Street

New Haven, CT 06510

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Charles Merrick

Attorney at Kaplan, Johnson, Abate & Bird

500 W. Jefferson Street, Suite 1400 Pnc Plaza

Louisville, KY 40202

Michael Patrick Abate

Attorney at Kaplan, Johnson, Abate & Bird

710 W. Main Street, Suite 400

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company by Aaron S. Bayer. Certificate of Service: 03/09/2021. [21-5129] (AB) [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:50 AM]

#15

(#15) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 04/22/2021. appellee brief now due 05/24/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 03/05/2021 09:12 AM]

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Charles Merrick for Appellant Joshua Donald Tarter Certificate of Service: 03/04/2021. [21-5129] (MCM) [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:04 PM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company by Lynsie Gaddis Rust. [21-5129] (LGR) [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:21 PM]

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David Scott Sheiffer for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (DSS) [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:33 PM]

#11

(#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Charles Merrick for Appellant Joshua Donald Tarter.. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (MCM) [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:24 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Joshua Donald Tarter by Michael P. Abate. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (MPA) [Entered: 02/25/2021 12:38 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company by David S. Sheiffer. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (DSS) [Entered: 02/25/2021 12:27 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company by Richard W. Boone Jr.. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (RWB) [Entered: 02/25/2021 12:24 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Joshua Donald Tarter by Michael C. Merrick. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (MCM) [Entered: 02/25/2021 09:54 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company by Jonathan M. Freiman. Certificate of Service: 02/24/2021. [21-5129] (JF) [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:49 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/12/2021 10:30 AM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/23/2021; appellee brief due 04/22/2021. (BLH) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:41 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Joshua Donald Tarter. Transcript needed: n. (BLH) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:38 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company by Aaron S. Bayer. Certificate of Service: 03/09/2021. [21-5129] (AB) [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 04/22/2021. appellee brief now due 05/24/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 03/05/2021 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Charles Merrick for Appellant Joshua Donald Tarter Certificate of Service: 03/04/2021. [21-5129] (MCM) [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company by Lynsie Gaddis Rust. [21-5129] (LGR) [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David Scott Sheiffer for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (DSS) [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Charles Merrick for Appellant Joshua Donald Tarter.. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (MCM) [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Joshua Donald Tarter by Michael P. Abate. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (MPA) [Entered: 02/25/2021 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company by David S. Sheiffer. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (DSS) [Entered: 02/25/2021 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company by Richard W. Boone Jr.. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (RWB) [Entered: 02/25/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Joshua Donald Tarter by Michael C. Merrick. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-5129] (MCM) [Entered: 02/25/2021 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Navigators Insurance Company by Jonathan M. Freiman. Certificate of Service: 02/24/2021. [21-5129] (JF) [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/12/2021 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 02/12/2021 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/23/2021; appellee brief due 04/22/2021. (BLH) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Beverly Harris (BLH) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Joshua Donald Tarter. Transcript needed: n. (BLH) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P. Abate