This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/04/2020 at 06:14:18 (UTC).

Joshua Hardin v. Doctor Cruz, et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Joshua Hardin filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Doctor Cruz. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-12920

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JOHN ZAK

MYERS

CRUZ

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOSHUA NEEL HARDIN

Florida City, FL 33034-6409

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Sidney Liebowitz

Attorney at Cruser Mitchell Novitz Sanchez Gaston & Zimet, LLP

121 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

Molly J. Durso

Attorney at Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis, LLP

485 N Keller Rd Ste 401

Maitland, FL 32751

Ana C. Dolney Francolin

Attorney at Cohen Law Group

350 N Lake Destiny Rd

Maitland, FL 32751

Brett A. Smith

Attorney at Cruser Mitchell Novitz Sanchez Gaston & Zimet, LLP

121 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dade CI Warden

Attorney at Dade CI - Inmate Trust Fund

19000 Sw 377Th St

Florida City, FL 33034-6409

Joshua Neel Hardin

Attorney at Dade CI - Inmate Legal Mail

19000 Sw 377Th St

Florida City, FL 33034-6409

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Joshua Neel Hardin. [Entered: 09/28/2020 09:50 AM]

Open Document #2

Notice of Receipt

Open Document #1

MP-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Joshua Neel Hardin failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 08/27/2020 02:58 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Joshua Neel Hardin. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/25/2020 08:44 AM]

Open Document #3

DC Order DE# 68

Open Document #2

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Joshua Neel Hardin. [Entered: 09/28/2020 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of receipt: Motion requesting extension of time with IFP as to Appellant Joshua Neel Hardin. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN This case is closed and a Motion to Reinstate has not been received. [Entered: 09/02/2020 06:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Joshua Neel Hardin failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 08/27/2020 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Joshua Neel Hardin. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/25/2020 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Joshua Neel Hardin on 08/03/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid USDC motion Pending: Motion to Withdraw as attorney for Appellees, DE# 73 08/06/2020. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 08/07/2020 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MYERS is a litigant

Latest cases where CRUZ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Neel Hardin