This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:18 (UTC).

Joshua Bolen v. Secretary of Public Safety

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Joshua Bolen filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary of Public Safety. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7033

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

JOSHUA BOLEN

Norlina, NC 27563

Respondent / Appellee

SECRETARY OF PUBLIC SAFETY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Joshua Bolen

Attorney at WARREN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P. O. Box 728

Norlina, NC 27563

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Clarence Joe DelForge III

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00513-LCB-JEP. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/03/2019. Case manager: ABrownlee. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:50 PM]

3 #1

Fee Notice

#8

(#8) ORDER filed [1000553419] deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Joshua Bolen [7]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Joshua Bolen WARREN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P. O. Box 728 Norlina, NC 27563. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:28 PM]

#2

(#2) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/30/2019. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:55 PM]

#6

(#6) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Joshua Bolen. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:27 PM]

#4

(#4) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Joshua Bolen WARREN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P. O. Box 728 Norlina, NC 27563. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:01 PM]

3 #2

IFP Application

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER filed [1000553419] deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Joshua Bolen [7]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Joshua Bolen WARREN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P. O. Box 728 Norlina, NC 27563. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • (#7) IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Joshua Bolen. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Joshua Bolen. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00513-LCB-JEP. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case? N/A. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/17/2019 08:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Joshua Bolen WARREN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P. O. Box 728 Norlina, NC 27563. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FEE NOTICE issued to Joshua Bolen - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 08/15/2019. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00513-LCB-JEP. Mailed to: Joshua Bolen WARREN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P. O. Box 728 Norlina, NC 27563. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/30/2019. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00513-LCB-JEP. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/03/2019. Case manager: ABrownlee. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-7033] AB [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.