This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:13 (UTC).

Joshua Barkley v. United States Department of La, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Joshua Barkley filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Department of La. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16386

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD

INDEPENDENT CERTIFIED EMERGENCY PROFESSIONALS OF ARIZONA

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF EMTS AND PARAMEDICS IAEP/NAGE/SEIU 5000

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOSHUA S. BARKLEY

Tempe, AZ 85282

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Helene Debra Lerner

Attorney at NLRB - National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street, S.E.

Washington, DC 20003

Kevin James Hobson Esquire

Attorney at NLRB - National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street, S.E.

Washington, DC 20003

Natalie Brooke Virden

Attorney at LUBIN & ENOCH, P.C.

349 North Fourth Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Michael Petitti Jr.

Attorney at Aiken Schenk

2390 E. Camelback, Suite 400

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Anne Elizabeth Nelson

Attorney at USPX - Office of the US Attorney

40 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joshua S. Barkley

2234 W Riveria Dr.

Tempe, AZ 85282

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Joshua S. Barkley Correspondence: Proof of Mailing / 7 copies of informal brief. Date of service: 08/07/2019 [11393902] [19-16386] (Barkley, Joshua) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:21 AM]

#9

(#9) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and MARK J. BENNETT) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; see also Bird v. Reese, 875 F.2d 256 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (order denying a motion for default judgment is not a final appealable order). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [11411870] (HC) [Entered: 08/27/2019 11:36 AM]

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#5

(#5) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Mr. Joshua S. Barkley. Date of service: 08/03/2019. [11387875]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to replace incorrect entry [4].] (RY) [Entered: 08/05/2019 05:31 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#6

(#6) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 5 ] submitted by Mr. Joshua S. Barkley is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: not applicable. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11388146] (GV) [Entered: 08/06/2019 09:06 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and MARK J. BENNETT) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; see also Bird v. Reese, 875 F.2d 256 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (order denying a motion for default judgment is not a final appealable order). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [11411870] (HC) [Entered: 08/27/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 5 ] filed by Mr. Joshua S. Barkley. [11394945] (SD) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Joshua S. Barkley Correspondence: Proof of Mailing / 7 copies of informal brief. Date of service: 08/07/2019 [11393902] [19-16386] (Barkley, Joshua) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 5 ] submitted by Mr. Joshua S. Barkley is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: not applicable. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11388146] (GV) [Entered: 08/06/2019 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Mr. Joshua S. Barkley. Date of service: 08/03/2019. [11387875]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to replace incorrect entry [4].] (RY) [Entered: 08/05/2019 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2019
  • (#4) COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Brief resubmitted using correct filing type in Entry: [ # 5 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Joshua S. Barkley FRAP 9(a) memorandum. Date of service: 08/03/2019. [11386169] [19-16386] (Barkley, Joshua) [Entered: 08/03/2019 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#3) Terminated Natalie Brooke Virden for International Association of EMTs and Paramedics IAEP/NAGE/SEIU 5000 and Independent Certified Emergency Professionals of Arizona in 19-16386 (Due to incorrect ECF account information). [11380746] (SLM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 07/16/2019. [11366536] (RT) [Entered: 07/17/2019 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Joshua S. Barkley opening brief due 09/16/2019. Appellees Independent Certified Emergency Professionals of Arizona, International Association of EMTs and Paramedics IAEP/NAGE/SEIU 5000, National Labor Relations Board and United States Department of Labor answering brief due 10/16/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11363033] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.