This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/09/2021 at 06:09:41 (UTC).

Joseph Harden v. USA

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 Joseph Harden filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-14655

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

JOSEPH HARDEN

Dania, FL 33004

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Harden

Attorney at Dismas Charities, LLC

141 Nw 1St Ave

Dania, FL 33004

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 Ne 4Th St

Miami, FL 33132

Laura Thomas Rivero

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

HAB-3 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

USDC Order or Motion on IFP

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Joseph Harden. [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:45 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Joseph Harden. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 01/21/2021 12:45 PM]

Open Document

USDC order: Motion for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee for his Notice of Appeal is GRANTED. Accordingly, Joseph Harden SHALL pay the required filing fee on or before Friday, January 29, 2021. as to Appellant Joseph Harden was filed on 12/31/2020. Docket Entry 14. [Entered: 01/13/2021 03:45 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Joseph Harden. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/30/2020 11:38 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Laura Thomas Rivero for USA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [20-14655] (ECF: Laura Rivero) [Entered: 12/28/2020 06:16 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laura Thomas Rivero for Appellee [20-14655] (ECF: Laura Rivero) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:26 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laura Thomas Rivero for USA [20-14655] (ECF: Laura Rivero) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:40 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [20-14655] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 12/18/2020 10:44 AM]

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Joseph Harden was filed on 12/01/2020. Docket Entry 10. [Entered: 12/14/2020 10:22 AM]

Open Document #3

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

usdc order 10

Open Document #1

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Joseph Harden was filed on 01/27/2021. Docket Entry 16. [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Joseph Harden. [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Joseph Harden. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 01/21/2021 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order: Motion for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee for his Notice of Appeal is GRANTED. Accordingly, Joseph Harden SHALL pay the required filing fee on or before Friday, January 29, 2021. as to Appellant Joseph Harden was filed on 12/31/2020. Docket Entry 14. [Entered: 01/13/2021 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Joseph Harden. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/30/2020 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Laura Thomas Rivero for USA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [20-14655] (ECF: Laura Rivero) [Entered: 12/28/2020 06:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laura Thomas Rivero for Appellee [20-14655] (ECF: Laura Rivero) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laura Thomas Rivero for USA [20-14655] (ECF: Laura Rivero) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [20-14655] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 12/18/2020 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order denying COA as to Appellant Joseph Harden was filed on 12/01/2020. Docket Entry 10. [Entered: 12/14/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Joseph Harden on 12/10/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 12/14/2020 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Thomas Rivero

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily M. Smachetti