This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:42 (UTC).

Joseph Guarascio v. Eric Wilson

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Joseph Guarascio filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Eric Wilson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10784

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

ERIC D. WILSON, Warden

Petitioner / Appellant

JOSEPH MICHAEL GUARASCIO

Oakdale, LA 71463-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1205 Texas Avenue

Lubbock, TX 79401

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Michael Guarascio

Attorney at FCI Oakdale I

P.O. Box 5000

Oakdale, LA 71463-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Guarascio [19-10784] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:31 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10784] (Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag ) [Entered: 08/20/2019 08:00 AM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Guarascio to extend time to file brief as appellant [9142123-2], to file brief in excess of the page limitations but not to exceed 15 pages pages [9142123-3]. [19-10784] (CNF) [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:47 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Guarascio [ # 9142123-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 10/15/2019 for Appellant Joseph Michael Guarascio; mooting Motion to file brief in excess pages filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Guarascio [ # 9142123-3 ] [19-10784] (CNF) [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:49 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 09/25/2019 for Appellant Joseph Michael Guarascio. [19-10784] (ABT) [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:46 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102881-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/06/2019 for Appellant Joseph Michael Guarascio [19-10784] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:57 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Guarascio [ # 9142123-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 10/15/2019 for Appellant Joseph Michael Guarascio; mooting Motion to file brief in excess pages filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Guarascio [ # 9142123-3 ] [19-10784] (CNF) [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Guarascio to extend time to file brief as appellant [9142123-2], to file brief in excess of the page limitations but not to exceed 15 pages pages [9142123-3]. [19-10784] (CNF) [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag for Appellee Eric D. Wilson in 19-10784 [19-10784] (CCR) [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10784] (Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag ) [Entered: 08/20/2019 08:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 09/25/2019 for Appellant Joseph Michael Guarascio. [19-10784] (ABT) [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10784] (ABT) [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-689. Electronic ROA due on 08/29/2019. [19-10784] (MFY) [Entered: 08/14/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Guarascio. Fee deadline satisfied [19-10784] (MFY) [Entered: 08/14/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102881-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/06/2019 for Appellant Joseph Michael Guarascio [19-10784] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Guarascio [19-10784] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.