This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/03/2021 at 06:40:28 (UTC).

Joseph Engel v. Jefferson County Courts, et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Joseph Engel filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Jefferson County Courts. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1509

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Lieutenant

Sheriff

Jefferson County Courts

Mental Health

Medical

Corporal

Jefferson County Prosecutor

Detective

Short

Jail Administrator

Shift Supervisor

Jefferson County Sheriff's Department

Sergeant

Plaintiff / Appellant

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Pacific, MO 63069-9799

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Attorney at MISSOURI EASTERN CORRECTIONAL CENTER

18701 Old Highway 66

Pacific, MO 63069-9799

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Prisoner Civil Rights Letter

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion & Affidavit for Permission to Appeal IFP

Open Restricted Document #2

ProSe NDA

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit (consisting of Page 1 only), filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Devon Engel w/service 04/12/2021. (NOTE: Appellant has only submitted for filing page 1 of the ifp motion. The motion was forwarded from district court.) [5024502] [21-1509] (CMH) [Entered: 04/12/2021 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5011073] [21-1509] (CMH) [Entered: 03/04/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 04/05/2021 [5011068] [21-1509] (CMH) [Entered: 03/04/2021 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Order of Dismissal both dated 1/21/2021, and Order dated 3/2/2021. [5011037] [21-1509] (CMH) [Entered: 03/04/2021 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [5011018] [21-1509] (CMH) [Entered: 03/04/2021 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Detective is a litigant

Latest cases where The Corporal is a litigant

Latest cases where LIEUTENANT is a litigant

Latest cases where Sergeant is a litigant