This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/04/2021 at 06:10:45 (UTC).

Joseph Engel v. ERDCC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Joseph Engel filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against ERDCC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2016

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Lieutenant Governor

Attorney General

Probation & Parole Director

Superintendent

Captain

Governor

Assistant Representative General

ERDCC

Warden

Lieutenant

Director of Religious Services

Major

IPO Supervisor ERDCC

Missouri Department of Correction

Chaplin

Eastern Reception, Diagnostic and Correctional Center

Director

Corrections Officer, 2

CCA

Plaintiff / Appellant

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Pacific, MO 63069-9799

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Attorney at MISSOURI EASTERN CORRECTIONAL CENTER

18701 Old Highway 66

Pacific, MO 63069-9799

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Prisoner Civil Rights Letter

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees or file a pleading int his court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Joseph Michael Devon Engel due 06/28/2021. [5044838] [21-2016] (CMH) [Entered: 06/14/2021 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5032394] [21-2016] (CMH) [Entered: 05/05/2021 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 06/04/2021. [5032389] [21-2016] (CMH) [Entered: 05/05/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & order and Order filed 2/23/2021, and Memorandum & Order filed 4/8/2021. [5032366] [21-2016] (CMH) [Entered: 05/05/2021 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [5032351] [21-2016] (CMH) [Entered: 05/05/2021 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAPLIN is a litigant

Latest cases where LIEUTENANT is a litigant

Latest cases where Probation & Parole is a litigant

Latest cases where Lieutenant Govenor is a litigant