This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/22/2021 at 06:05:45 (UTC).

Joseph Engel v. Corrections Officer, et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Joseph Engel filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Corrections Officer. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2378

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CCA

Institutional Parole Officer Supervisor

Major

Senator

Institutional Parole Officer Probation and Parole

Captain

Probation & Parole Director

Lieutenant Governor

Corporal

Assistant Director of Probation & Parole

Director

Caseworker

Warden

Eastern Reception, Diagnostic and Correctional Center

House of Representatives, Missouri

Corrections Officer, 1

Sergeant

Missouri Department of Correction

Corrections Officer, 2

Plaintiff / Appellant

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Pacific, MO 63069-9799

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Attorney at MISSOURI EASTERN CORRECTIONAL CENTER

18701 Old Highway 66

Pacific, MO 63069-9799

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Prisoner Civil Rights Letter

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees or file a response to the 6/23/2021 order of this court. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Joseph Michael Devon Engel due 08/24/2021. [5064329] [21-2378] (CMH) [Entered: 08/10/2021 06:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5048227] [21-2378] (CMH) [Entered: 06/23/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 07/23/2021 [5048221] [21-2378] (CMH) [Entered: 06/23/2021 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Order of Dismissal both filed 3/17/2021, and Memorandum & Order filed 6/22/2021. [5048216] [21-2378] (CMH) [Entered: 06/23/2021 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [5048209] [21-2378] (CMH) [Entered: 06/23/2021 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SENATOR is a litigant

Latest cases where The Corporal is a litigant

Latest cases where Sergeant is a litigant

Latest cases where Caseworker is a litigant