This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/03/2021 at 06:40:11 (UTC).

Joseph Engel v. Corrections Officer 1, et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Joseph Engel filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Corrections Officer 1. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1507

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Lieutenant Governor

Attorney General

Superintendent

Captain

Governor

Assistant Representative General

Assistant Director

Warden

Lieutenant

Missouri Department of Corrections

Major

IPO Supervisor ERDCC

Eastern Reception, Diagnostic and Correctional Center

Missouri House of Representatives

Director

Corrections Officer, 2

Director of Probation & Parole

IPO ERDCC

Assistant Superintendent

Plaintiff / Appellant

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Pacific, MO 63069-9799

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Attorney at MISSOURI EASTERN CORRECTIONAL CENTER

18701 Old Highway 66

Pacific, MO 63069-9799

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document #1

NOA Packet

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion (1 Page)

Open Restricted Document #2

ProSe NDA

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit (1 Page Total) filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Michael Devon Engel w/service, 04/09/2021. [5023897] [21-1507] (CJO) [Entered: 04/09/2021 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5010983] [21-1507] (CJO) [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:This court has previously determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 04/05/2021 [5010982] [21-1507] (CJO) [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order 12/21/2020, Order of Disimissal 01/25/2021, Memorandum and Order 03/02/2021, and envelope (in which the NOA was mailed) e-mailed by the d.c. separately, post-marked 02/10/2021 and received in the d.c. on 02/26/2021. [5010980] [21-1507] (CJO) [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [5010974] [21-1507] (CJO) [Entered: 03/04/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Missouri House of Representatives is a litigant

Latest cases where LIEUTENANT is a litigant

Latest cases where Lieutenant Govenor is a litigant

Latest cases where Major is a litigant