This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/17/2022 at 06:10:32 (UTC).

Joseph Engel v. Corizon, et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Joseph Engel filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Corizon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1347

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Pacific, MO 63069-9799

Defendant / Appellees

Corizon

ERDCC

CO1

CO2

Sergeant

Lieutenant

Captain

Corporal

FUM

Caseworker

Caseworker, 2

Assistant Superintendent

Assistant Warden

Warden

CCA

IPO ERDCC

Assistant Director of Probation & Parole

Director of Probation & Parole

Missouri Department of Correction

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Michael Devon Engel

Attorney at MISSOURI EASTERN CORRECTIONAL CENTER

18701 Old Highway 66

Pacific, MO 63069-9799

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Prisoner case docketed. [5128188] [22-1347] (CMH) [Entered: 02/16/2022 12:49 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Order 3/19/2021, Memorandum & Order 1/14/2022. [5128194] [22-1347] (CMH) [Entered: 02/16/2022 12:54 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5128197] [22-1347] (CMH) [Entered: 02/16/2022 12:57 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 03/18/2022 [5128199] [22-1347] (CMH) [Entered: 02/16/2022 12:58 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees or to file a response to the 2/16/2022 order in this court. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Joseph Michael Devon Engel due 04/11/2022. [5140854] [22-1347] (CMH) [Entered: 03/28/2022 10:59 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees or to file a response to the 2/16/2022 order in this court. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Joseph Michael Devon Engel due 04/11/2022. [5140854] [22-1347] (CMH) [Entered: 03/28/2022 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 03/18/2022 [5128199] [22-1347] (CMH) [Entered: 02/16/2022 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5128197] [22-1347] (CMH) [Entered: 02/16/2022 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Order 3/19/2021, Memorandum & Order 1/14/2022. [5128194] [22-1347] (CMH) [Entered: 02/16/2022 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [5128188] [22-1347] (CMH) [Entered: 02/16/2022 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Corporal is a litigant

Latest cases where LIEUTENANT is a litigant