This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2019 at 06:04:11 (UTC).

Joseph Chhim v. City of Houston, et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Joseph Chhim filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of Houston. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20153

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF HOUSTON

LUNA NELSON, In the Official Capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOSEPH CHHIM

Houston, TX 77088-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Dennis J. Jackson

Attorney at City of Houston

900 Bagby Street

Houston, TX 77002

Robert William Higgason

Attorney at City of Houston

900 Bagby Street

Houston, TX 77002

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Chhim

5634 Windsor Forest Drive

Houston, TX 77088-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Document

CORRECTED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Chhim to appoint counsel [9043002-2]. Replaces the motion filed 04/02/2019 Date of Service: 04/27/2019 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: motion being accepted in present form. [19-20153] (CAS) [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:53 AM]

Open Document #2

Exhibits in Support

Open Document #1

Corrected Motion Filed (replaces previously filed motion)

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/21/2019 for Appellant Joseph Chhim. [19-20153] (DDL) [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:09 AM]

Open Document

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion to appoint counsel [ # 9022342-2 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Chhim Date of Service: 03/28/2019 [19-20153] (CAS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:34 PM]

Open Document #3

form(s) sent

Open Document #2

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20153] (Robert William Higgason ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 10:00 AM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Chhim [19-20153] (CSG) [Entered: 03/11/2019 12:05 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Chhim to extend time to file brief as appellant [9045862-2]. Date of service: 05/01/2019 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: Need certificate of compliance, need opposition stated, need the amount of time requested. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 05/16/2019 for Appellant Joseph Chhim [19-20153] (CAS) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Chhim to appoint counsel [9043002-2]. Replaces the motion filed 04/02/2019 Date of Service: 04/27/2019 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: motion being accepted in present form. [19-20153] (CAS) [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Chhim to appoint counsel [9036536-2]. Replaces the motion filed 04/02/2019 Date of Service: 04/20/2019 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: still missing certificate of compliance [19-20153] (CAS) [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Certificate of compliance received from Appellant Mr. Joseph Chhim because wrong information in the certificate [19-20153] (CAS) [Entered: 04/12/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/21/2019 for Appellant Joseph Chhim. [19-20153] (DDL) [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20153] (DDL) [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:17-CV-1975. Electronic ROA due on 04/22/2019. [19-20153] (CAS) [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion to appoint counsel [ # 9022342-2 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Chhim Date of Service: 03/28/2019 [19-20153] (CAS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Chhim to appoint counsel [9022342-2] Affidavit due on 04/25/2019 for Appellant Joseph Chhim. Date of service: 03/28/2019 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: missing certificate of service and certificate of compliance. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 04/15/2019 for Appellant Joseph Chhim [19-20153] (CAS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert William Higgason for party(s) Appellee Luna Nelson Appellee City of Houston, in case 19-20153 [19-20153] (ABT) [Entered: 03/26/2019 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20153] (Robert William Higgason ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9005172-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.Motion for IFP pending in DC. [19-20153] (CSG) [Entered: 03/14/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Chhim [19-20153] (CSG) [Entered: 03/11/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less