This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/01/2020 at 06:06:33 (UTC).

Joseph Blackburn, Jr. v. Dare County

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Joseph Blackburn, Jr filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dare County. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2056

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DARE COUNTY

TOWN OF DUCK

TOWN OF MANTEO

TOWN OF SOUTHERN SHORES

TOWN OF KILL DEVIL HILLS

TOWN OF KITTY HAWK

TOWN OF NAGS HEAD

Plaintiff / Appellants

JOSEPH E. BLACKBURN, JR.

LINDA C. BLACKBURN, all similarly situated individuals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher J. Geis

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

1 West 4Th Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Brian Florencio Castro

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

1 West 4Th Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Norwood Pitt Blanchard III

Attorney at CROSSLEY MCINTOSH COLLIER HANLEY & EDES PLLC

5002 Randall Parkway

Wilmington, NC 28403

Clay Allen Collier

Attorney at CROSSLEY MCINTOSH COLLIER HANLEY & EDES PLLC

5002 Randall Parkway

Wilmington, NC 28403

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lloyd Clifton Smith III

Attorney at PRITCHETT & BURCH PLLC

101 Lawyers Lane, P. O. Drawer 100

Windsor, NC 27983

Lloyd C. Smith Jr.

Attorney at PRITCHETT & BURCH PLLC

101 Lawyers Lane, P. O. Drawer 100

Windsor, NC 27983

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) BRIEF by Joseph E. Blackburn, Jr. and Linda C. Blackburn in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000846067] [20-2056] Lloyd Smith [Entered: 11/11/2020 08:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Joseph E. Blackburn, Jr. and Linda C. Blackburn. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1000846066] [20-2056] Lloyd Smith [Entered: 11/11/2020 08:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket correction requested from Corey Ann Finn, S. Wade Yeoman, and Lloyd Smith Jr. Mailed to: Corey Ann Finn, S. Wade Yeoman. [20-2056] KH [Entered: 11/10/2020 04:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by S. Wade Yeoman for Joseph E. Blackburn, Jr. and Linda C. Blackburn. [1000845782] [20-2056] Lloyd Smith [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Corey Ann Finn for Linda C. Blackburn and Joseph E. Blackburn, Jr.. [1000845780] [20-2056] Lloyd Smith [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lloyd C. Smith, Jr. for Joseph E. Blackburn, Jr. and Linda C. Blackburn. [1000844736] [20-2056] Lloyd Smith [Entered: 11/09/2020 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joseph E. Blackburn, Jr. and Linda C. Blackburn. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000843799] [20-2056] Lloyd Smith [Entered: 11/06/2020 03:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lloyd C. Smith III for Joseph E. Blackburn, Jr. and Linda C. Blackburn. [1000843798] [20-2056] Lloyd Smith [Entered: 11/06/2020 03:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Joseph E. Blackburn, Jr. and Linda C. Blackburn. [20-2056] Lloyd Smith [Entered: 11/06/2020 03:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Clay A. Collier for Kill Devil Hills, Town of Duck, Town of Kitty Hawk, Town of Manteo, Town of Nags Head and Town of Southern Shores. [1000843716] [20-2056] Norwood Blanchard [Entered: 11/06/2020 01:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Norwood P. Blanchard, III for Kill Devil Hills, Town of Duck, Town of Kitty Hawk, Town of Manteo, Town of Southern Shores and Town of Nags Head. [1000843715] [20-2056] Norwood Blanchard [Entered: 11/06/2020 01:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Kill Devil Hills, Town of Duck, Town of Kitty Hawk, Town of Manteo, Town of Nags Head and Town of Southern Shores re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 11/09/2020 from Norwood Pitt Blanchard III, Christopher J. Geis and Clay Allen Collier. Mailed to: Clay Collier, Stuart Yeoman. [20-2056] KH [Entered: 11/04/2020 09:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Joseph E. Blackburn, Jr. and Linda C. Blackburn re: filing of appearance form, filing of disclosure form, filing of docketing statement. Appearance form due on 11/09/2020 from Corey Ann Finn, Lloyd Clifton Smith Jr., Lloyd Clifton Smith III and Stuart Wade Yeoman. Disclosure statement due from Joseph E. Blackburn Jr., Linda C. Blackburn on 11/09/2020. Docketing statement due from Joseph E. Blackburn Jr. and Linda C. Blackburn on 11/09/2020. Mailed to: Clay Collier, Stuart Yeoman. [20-2056] KH [Entered: 11/04/2020 09:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dare County. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000827271] [20-2056] Christopher Geis [Entered: 10/12/2020 09:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher J. Geis for Dare County. [1000827270] [20-2056] Christopher Geis [Entered: 10/12/2020 09:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian F. Castro for Dare County. [1000827269] [20-2056] Brian Castro [Entered: 10/12/2020 09:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Corey Finn and Stuart Yeoman. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/12/2020. Response Brief due 12/11/2020. [20-2056] KH [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-00027-FL. Mailed to: Corey Finn, Stuart Yeoman. [20-2056] KH [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-00027-FL. Case manager: KHancock. [20-2056] KH [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dare County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lloyd Clifton Smith, III