This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:09:39 (UTC).

Jose Zaldivar, Sr. v. Charles Ryan, et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Jose Zaldivar, Sr filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Charles Ryan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15442

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GALLARDO

N. COURTNEY

SANDRA CHAMERLAIN

FRANCISCO

S. WASHBURN

TANYA SCHELL

KEVIN M. PRATT

DORA B. SCHRIRO, Warden

JULIE ERWIN

DOES, John Doe 1-100; Jane Doe 1-100; Jonh/Jane Does #23-41, 42-61, 64-81, 82-101, 104-121, 122-151, 158-171, 176-222, 224-274, 276-326, 330-378, 381-430; John Doe-Federal 1-100; Jane Doe-Federal 1-100

WUERTZ

PERRY

VIRGINIA HOOPES

BARR

CARLSON

O'BRIEN

AMBER NORTON

ASHWORTH

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOSE ADALBERTO ZALDIVAR, Sr.

Florence, AZ 85132

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jose Adalberto Zaldivar Sr.

Attorney at ASPCE - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX (EYMAN)

P.O. Box 3300

Florence, AZ 85132

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 04/08/2019. [Case Number 19-15442: Partially Paid] [11258840] (RL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 09:22 AM]

6 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

6 #1

Main Document

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant Jose Adalberto Zaldivar, Sr. motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/30/2019. [11285299] (JFF) [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:12 PM]

#9

(#9) Streamlined request by Appellant Jose Adalberto Zaldivar, Sr. to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [11291999] (BG) [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:13 AM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#4

(#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11250316] (CKP) [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:51 PM]

#3

(#3) Received copy of District Court order filed on 03/28/2019 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status should continue on appeal. 2. The Clerk is directed to provide a copy of this order to the Ninth Circuit. [11245758] (RL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:39 PM]

#8

(#8) Filed Appellant Jose Adalberto Zaldivar, Sr. letter dated 05/06/2019 re: request copy of federal rules and copy docket sheet(sent copy). Paper filing deficiency: None. [11290406] (JFF) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:08 AM]

1 #2

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11229197] (CKP) [Entered: 03/15/2019 10:45 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Streamlined request by Appellant Jose Adalberto Zaldivar, Sr. to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [11291999] (BG) [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed Appellant Jose Adalberto Zaldivar, Sr. letter dated 05/06/2019 re: request copy of federal rules and copy docket sheet(sent copy). Paper filing deficiency: None. [11290406] (JFF) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed Appellant Jose Adalberto Zaldivar, Sr. motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/30/2019. [11285299] (JFF) [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11265556] (CKP) [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 04/08/2019. [Case Number 19-15442: Partially Paid] [11258840] (RL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11250316] (CKP) [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Received copy of District Court order filed on 03/28/2019 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status should continue on appeal. 2. The Clerk is directed to provide a copy of this order to the Ninth Circuit. [11245758] (RL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11229197] (CKP) [Entered: 03/15/2019 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jose Adalberto Zaldivar Sr. opening brief due 05/07/2019. [11224390] (JBS) [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.