This case was last updated from PACER on 04/07/2019 at 06:03:55 (UTC).

Jose Sanchez, et al v. Secretary United States Depart, et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 Jose Sanchez filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Secretary United States Depart. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1311

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

DISTRICT DIRECTOR UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES NEWARK

DIRECTOR UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES NEBRASKA SERVICE CENTER

DIRECTOR UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

Plaintiff / Appellees

SONIA GONZALEZ

JOSE SANTOS SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher Amore Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Ubaid Ul-Haq Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Michael J. DeBenedictis Esq.

Attorney at Debenedictis & Debenedictis

20 Brace Road, Suite 350

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief & Appendix until/for 6/3/2019. Certificate of Service dated 03/11/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:27 PM]

Open Document #2

Briefing Notice Issued

Open Document #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. DeBenedictis on behalf of Appellee(s) Jose Sanchez, Sonia Gonzalez. [19-1311] (MJD) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:02 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ubaid ul-Haq on behalf of Appellant(s) Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security; Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; Director, USCIS Nebraska Service Center; District Director, USCIS Newark District Office. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 02/19/2019 02:40 PM]

Open Document

NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security requesting Entry of Appearance Form. Compliance due 02/22/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:49 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security, received. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:11 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security, filed. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:10 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ubaid ul-Haq on behalf of Appellant(s) Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security; Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; Director USCIS Nebraska Service Center; District Director, USCIS Newark District Office. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:09 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security advising this court that no transcripts are available. Requested date(s) are: N/A, to be filed by N/A. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:07 PM]

Open Document #6

OPINION

Open Document #5

ORDER

Open Document #4

Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

STANDING ORDER

Open Document #2

Case Caption

Open Document #1

Case Opening Letter

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting motion for extension of time filed by Appellants Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center. Appellants' brief must be filed and served on or before June 3, 2019. (MB) [Entered: 03/13/2019 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief & Appendix until/for 6/3/2019. Certificate of Service dated 03/11/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security due on or before 04/02/2019. Appendix due on or before 04/02/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. DeBenedictis on behalf of Appellee(s) Jose Sanchez, Sonia Gonzalez. [19-1311] (MJD) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Entry of Appearance Form received from Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security. (LMR) [Entered: 02/19/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ubaid ul-Haq on behalf of Appellant(s) Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security; Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; Director, USCIS Nebraska Service Center; District Director, USCIS Newark District Office. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 02/19/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security requesting Entry of Appearance Form. Compliance due 02/22/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security, received. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security, filed. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ubaid ul-Haq on behalf of Appellant(s) Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security; Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; Director USCIS Nebraska Service Center; District Director, USCIS Newark District Office. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security advising this court that no transcripts are available. Requested date(s) are: N/A, to be filed by N/A. [19-1311] (UU) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Nebraska Service Center, District Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Newark and Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security in District Court No. 1-16-cv-00651. (LMR) [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less