This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2019 at 06:11:24 (UTC).

Jose Rosado v. City of Miami Gardens

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Jose Rosado filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Miami Gardens. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11170

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOSE ROSADO

Defendant / Appellee

CITY OF MIAMI GARDENS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Phillip Andrew Ortiz

Attorney at The Firm Law Group

14100 Palmetto Frontage Rd Ste 390

Hialeah, FL 33016

Yechezkel Rodal

Attorney at Rodal Law, PA

5300 Nw 33Rd Ave Ste 219

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher J. Stearns

Attorney at Johnson Anselmo Murdoch Burke Piper & Hochman, PA

2455 E Sunrise Blvd Ste 1000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

Damian H. Albert

Attorney at Johnson Anselmo Murdoch Burke Piper & Hochman, PA

2455 E Sunrise Blvd Ste 1000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

Scott D. Alexander

Attorney at Johnson Anselmo Murdoch Burke Piper & Hochman, PA

2455 E Sunrise Blvd Ste 1000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

Michael R. Piper

Attorney at Johnson Anselmo Murdoch Burke Piper & Hochman, PA

2455 E Sunrise Blvd Ste 1000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

 

Court Documents

Open Document #4

DC Order Doc 87

Open Document #1

ATTY-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Phillip Andrew Ortiz for Appellant Jose Rosado and Yechezkel Rodal for Appellant Jose Rosado. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:59 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Yechezkel Rodal for Jose Rosado. [19-11170] (ECF: Yechezkel Rodal) [Entered: 04/14/2019 12:28 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Yechezkel Rodal for Jose Rosado. [19-11170] (ECF: Yechezkel Rodal) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:58 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher J. Stearns for City of Miami Gardens. [19-11170] (ECF: Christopher Stearns) [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:36 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC Judgment Doc 74

Open Document #5

DC Order Doc 73

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael R. Piper for City of Miami Gardens. [19-11170] (ECF: Michael Piper) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:01 PM]

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #2

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael R. Piper for Appellee City of Miami Gardens. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11170] (ECF: Michael Piper) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:30 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11170] (ECF: Yechezkel Rodal) [Entered: 04/14/2019 12:29 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Yechezkel Rodal for Appellant Jose Rosado. [19-11170] (ECF: Yechezkel Rodal) [Entered: 04/14/2019 12:57 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Yechezkel Rodal for Appellant Jose Rosado. Appellants brief due on 05/20/2019 as to Appellant Jose Rosado. Appendix due on 05/28/2019 as to Appellant Jose Rosado. [Entered: 05/02/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher J. Stearns for City of Miami Gardens. [19-11170] (ECF: Christopher Stearns) [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael R. Piper for City of Miami Gardens. [19-11170] (ECF: Michael Piper) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael R. Piper for Appellee City of Miami Gardens. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11170] (ECF: Michael Piper) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Yechezkel Rodal for Jose Rosado. [19-11170] (ECF: Yechezkel Rodal) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Yechezkel Rodal for Jose Rosado is not on the correct form for an appearance of counsel form. Please use the correct form which is located on our website. [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Yechezkel Rodal for Appellant Jose Rosado. [19-11170] (ECF: Yechezkel Rodal) [Entered: 04/14/2019 12:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11170] (ECF: Yechezkel Rodal) [Entered: 04/14/2019 12:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Yechezkel Rodal for Jose Rosado. [19-11170] (ECF: Yechezkel Rodal) [Entered: 04/14/2019 12:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Phillip Andrew Ortiz for Appellant Jose Rosado and Yechezkel Rodal for Appellant Jose Rosado. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jose Rosado on 03/25/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/06/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/08/2019 as to Appellant Jose Rosado. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/22/2019 as to Appellee City of Miami Gardens [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.