This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:08:18 (UTC).

Jose Blanco Martinez v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Jose Blanco Martinez filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70381

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSE ROLANDO BLANCO MARTINEZ

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Anya McLean

Attorney at McLean Law Firm PLC

3030 N. Central Avenue, Suite # 402

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Respondent Attorney

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Petition for Review with Motion for Stay of Removal

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11595713]. [20-70381] (CD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. COUNSELED. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 03/18/2020. Response to motion for stay due 04/08/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Jose Rolando Blanco Martinez. Respondent brief due 07/16/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11595327] (JMR) [Entered: 02/12/2020 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.