This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/07/2020 at 06:09:28 (UTC).

Jonathan Savas, et al v. CSLEA, et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Jonathan Savas filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CSLEA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56045

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

KENT MERTINS

TRISTAN TRAUB

JOSHUA RAYMOND

FRANK HARWOOD

MOSES HAASE

ANDRES MENDOZA

JON HERNANDEZ

ANDREW COX, as individuals and on behalf of all others similarly situated

CARTER FENLEY

LAUREN ASHBY

JESS HILLER

MACKENZIE KOEPSELL

ALEC FLETES

CHRISTIAN ESPINOZA

YURUAN QUINONES

COLE HEYDORFF

BELLA BARDEEN

Defendant / Appellees

BETTY YEE, in her official capacity as State Controller of California

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California

CALIFORNIA STATE LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, a labor organization

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mariah Gondeiro Esquire

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Rebekah Millard

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Maureen C. Onyeagbako

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Anthony R. Hakl

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Cassandra M. Ferrannini

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall, 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Christopher Kolkey

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall, 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including requests for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's office. [11858798] (BLS) [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:07 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Lauren Ashby, Ethan Balter, Bella Bardeen, Paul Carey, Andrew Cox, Christian Espinoza, Carter Fenley, Alec Fletes, Moses Haase, Frank Harwood, Jon Hernandez, Cole Heydorff, Jess Hiller, Mackenzie Koepsell, Jennifer Marshall, Andres Mendoza, Kent Mertins, Yuruan Quinones, Joshua Raymond, Brad Rollins, Jonathan Savas, Tristan Traub and Adam Wright Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/13/2020. [11856783] [20-56045] (Gondeiro, Mariah) [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:32 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellee California State Law Enforcement Agency Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/09/2020. [11854074] [20-56045] (Ferrannini, Cassandra) [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:04 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#8) Streamlined request [7] by Appellants Lauren Ashby, Ethan Balter, Bella Bardeen, Paul Carey, Andrew Cox, Christian Espinoza, Carter Fenley, Alec Fletes, Moses Haase, Frank Harwood, Jon Hernandez, Cole Heydorff, Jess Hiller, Mackenzie Koepsell, Jennifer Marshall, Andres Mendoza, Kent Mertins, Yuruan Quinones, Joshua Raymond, Brad Rollins, Jonathan Savas, Tristan Traub and Adam Wright to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Lauren Ashby, Ethan Balter, Bella Bardeen, Paul Carey, Andrew Cox, Christian Espinoza, Carter Fenley, Alec Fletes, Moses Haase, Frank Harwood, Jon Hernandez, Cole Heydorff, Jess Hiller, Mackenzie Koepsell, Jennifer Marshall, Andres Mendoza, Kent Mertins, Yuruan Quinones, Joshua Raymond, Brad Rollins, Jonathan Savas, Tristan Traub and Adam Wright opening brief due 01/06/2021. Appellees Xavier Becerra, California State Law Enforcement Agency and Betty Yee answering brief due 02/05/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11894007] (BG) [Entered: 11/16/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Lauren Ashby, Ethan Balter, Bella Bardeen, Paul Carey, Andrew Cox, Christian Espinoza, Carter Fenley, Alec Fletes, Moses Haase, Frank Harwood, Jon Hernandez, Cole Heydorff, Jess Hiller, Mackenzie Koepsell, Jennifer Marshall, Andres Mendoza, Kent Mertins, Yuruan Quinones, Joshua Raymond, Brad Rollins, Jonathan Savas, Tristan Traub and Adam Wright. New requested due date is 01/04/2021. [11892703] [20-56045] (Gondeiro, Mariah) [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including requests for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's office. [11858798] (BLS) [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/13/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11857321]. [20-56045] (AD) [Entered: 10/13/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Lauren Ashby, Ethan Balter, Bella Bardeen, Paul Carey, Andrew Cox, Christian Espinoza, Carter Fenley, Alec Fletes, Moses Haase, Frank Harwood, Jon Hernandez, Cole Heydorff, Jess Hiller, Mackenzie Koepsell, Jennifer Marshall, Andres Mendoza, Kent Mertins, Yuruan Quinones, Joshua Raymond, Brad Rollins, Jonathan Savas, Tristan Traub and Adam Wright Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/13/2020. [11856783] [20-56045] (Gondeiro, Mariah) [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/09/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11854151]. [20-56045] (AD) [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellee California State Law Enforcement Agency Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/09/2020. [11854074] [20-56045] (Ferrannini, Cassandra) [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Lauren Ashby, Ethan Balter, Bella Bardeen, Paul Carey, Andrew Cox, Christian Espinoza, Carter Fenley, Alec Fletes, Moses Haase, Frank Harwood, Jon Hernandez, Cole Heydorff, Jess Hiller, Mackenzie Koepsell, Jennifer Marshall, Andres Mendoza, Kent Mertins, Yuruan Quinones, Joshua Raymond, Brad Rollins, Jonathan Savas, Tristan Traub and Adam Wright Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/15/2020. Appellants Lauren Ashby, Ethan Balter, Bella Bardeen, Paul Carey, Andrew Cox, Christian Espinoza, Carter Fenley, Alec Fletes, Moses Haase, Frank Harwood, Jon Hernandez, Cole Heydorff, Jess Hiller, Mackenzie Koepsell, Jennifer Marshall, Andres Mendoza, Kent Mertins, Yuruan Quinones, Joshua Raymond, Brad Rollins, Jonathan Savas, Tristan Traub and Adam Wright opening brief due 12/07/2020. Appellees Xavier Becerra, California State Law Enforcement Agency and Betty Yee answering brief due 01/06/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11851913] (JBS) [Entered: 10/08/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Richard Hakl, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cassandra M Ferrannini

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maureen Chinyere Onyeagbako(Designation Assistant US Attorney)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Miles Kolkey