This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:42 (UTC).

Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio v. Secretary, Department of Corr., et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corr . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12678

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

JONATHAN MONSANTO-BERRIO

Florida City, FL 33034-6409

Respondent / Appellees

ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF FLORIDA

SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio

Attorney at Dade CI - Inmate Legal Mail

19000 Sw 377Th St

Florida City, FL 33034-6409

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

3507 E Frontage Rd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

MOT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #2

USDC Order on IFP

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Ashley Moody for Secretary, Department of Corrections and Attorney General, State of Florida. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/14/2019 10:13 AM]

Open Document #3

District Court Order, DE # 28

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #4

District Court Judgment, DE # 29

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

HAB-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:01 AM]

Open Document #1

EXT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Motion for extension to file COA motion Filed

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio was filed on 06/12/2019. Docket Entry 28. [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:49 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio. [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:59 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file motion for COA filed by Appellant Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio is GRANTED. [ # 8860474-2 ] COA due on 11/08/2019. JP [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time of 60 days to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability filed by Appellant Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8860474-1] [Entered: 08/22/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8860469-1] [Entered: 08/22/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Ashley Moody for Secretary, Department of Corrections and Attorney General, State of Florida. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/14/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio was filed on 08/05/2019. Docket Entry 33. [Entered: 08/06/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio. [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio was filed on 06/12/2019. Docket Entry 28. [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jonathan Monsanto-Berrio on 07/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.