This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:30 (UTC).

Jonathan Fellus v. Select Medical Holdings Corp, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Jonathan Fellus filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Select Medical Holdings Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2546

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

CNA HEALTHPRO CLAIMS

ESIS PROCLAIM

Defendant / Appellees

SELECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORP

COLUMBIA CASUALTY CO

Plaintiff / Appellant

JONATHAN FELLUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Samantha M. Evans Esq.

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Deborah M. Minkoff Esq.

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Melissa A. Cornibe Esq.

Attorney at CNA Coverage Litigation Group

100 Matsonford Road, Building 3, Suite 200

Radnor, PA 19087

Edward M. Napierkowski Esq.

Attorney at Connor Weber & Oberlies

2401 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 1C-47

Philadelphia, PA 19130

Karen H. Ventrell Esq.

Attorney at CNA Coverage Litigation Group

2020 K Street, N.W., Suite 750

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Evan L. Goldman Esq.

Attorney at Goldman Davis Krumholz & Dillon

3 University Plaza, Suite 410

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Columbia Casualty Co, filed. [19-2546] (KHV) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:40 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Karen Ventrell on behalf of Appellee(s) Columbia Casualty Company. [19-2546] (KHV) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:38 AM]

Open Document #5

Standing Order

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jonathan Fellus advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-2546] (ELG) [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:10 PM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Select Medical Holdings Corp, filed. [19-2546] (DMM) [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:37 AM]

Open Document #3

District Court Opinion 060519

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document

Appendix Citation Notice sent to Evan L. Goldman, Esq., Melissa A. Cornibe, Esq., Samantha M. Evans, Esq., Deborah M. Minkoff, Esq., Edward M. Napierkowski, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/29/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:39 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Instructions

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Deborah M. Minkoff on behalf of Appellee(s) Select Medical Holdings Corp.. [19-2546] (DMM) [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:31 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Evan L. Goldman, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Jonathan Fellus, MD. [19-2546] (ELG) [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:08 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Jonathan Fellus, received. [19-2546] (ELG) [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:13 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Melissa A. Cornibe, Esq. for Columbia Casualty Co and Edward M. Napierkowski, Esq. for Columbia Casualty Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/13/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/13/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:53 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Columbia Casualty Co, filed. [19-2546] (KHV) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Karen Ventrell on behalf of Appellee(s) Columbia Casualty Company. [19-2546] (KHV) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Melissa A. Cornibe, Esq. for Columbia Casualty Co and Edward M. Napierkowski, Esq. for Columbia Casualty Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/13/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/13/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Select Medical Holdings Corp, filed. [19-2546] (DMM) [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Deborah M. Minkoff on behalf of Appellee(s) Select Medical Holdings Corp.. [19-2546] (DMM) [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Jonathan Fellus, received. [19-2546] (ELG) [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Fellus, filed. [19-2546] (ELG) [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jonathan Fellus advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-2546] (ELG) [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Evan L. Goldman, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Jonathan Fellus, MD. [19-2546] (ELG) [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix Citation Notice sent to Evan L. Goldman, Esq., Melissa A. Cornibe, Esq., Samantha M. Evans, Esq., Deborah M. Minkoff, Esq., Edward M. Napierkowski, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/29/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jonathan Fellus in District Court No. 2-17-cv-04489. (KR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.