This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/29/2022 at 06:08:59 (UTC).

Jonathan Dunn v. Lloyd Austin, III, et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Jonathan Dunn filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lloyd Austin, III,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15286

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JONATHAN DUNN, Lieutenant Colonel

Defendant / Appellees

LLOYD J. AUSTIN III, US Secretary of Defense

FRANK KENDALL, US Secretary of the Air Force

GREGORY M. HAYNES, Colonel

JEFFREY PENNINGTON, Major General

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE

Amicus Curiae

TODD ZYWICKI, Professor

JEFFREY SINGER, M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Thomas Murphy Molloy

1125 Wedgewood Drive

Waco, TX 76712

Donald Falk

Attorney at Schaerr Jaffe, LLP

4 Embarcadero Center, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94306

Joshua James Prince

Attorney at Schaerr Jaffe, LLP

1717 K Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20006

Gene C. Schaerr

Attorney at Schaerr Jaffe, LLP

1717 K Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah W. Carroll

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Casen Ross

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Lowell Sturgill Jr.

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Frederick R. Yarger

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 34 ] submitted by appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The supplemental excerpts of record [ # 35 ] submitted by appellees are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12427848] (KWG) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:49 PM]

#35

(#35) Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, III, DOD, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall and Jeffrey Pennington. Date of service: 04/21/2022. [12427805] [22-15286] (Carroll, Sarah) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:33 PM]

#34

(#34) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, III, DOD, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall and Jeffrey Pennington. Date of service: 04/21/2022. [12427800] [22-15286] (Carroll, Sarah) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:29 PM]

#32

(#32) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND and BRIDGET S. BADE) Order by Judges TASHIMA and FRIEDLAND; Dissent by Judge BADE. Appellants opposed emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 11 ]) is denied. See Winter v. Nat. Res. Def. Council, Inc., 555 U.S. 7, 20 (2008). Appellants request to extend the grant of interim relief, set forth in the reply brief in support of the motion, is denied. The interim stay granted in the March 11, 2022 order is terminated. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. BADE, Circuit Judge, dissenting: I would grant the emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal and, in the absence of an injunction, I would extend interim relief to allow Appellant to seek emergency relief from the Supreme Court. [12411036] (JMR) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:59 PM]

27 #2

Appendix A

27 #1

Brief of Amici Curiae

11 #5

Excerpts Vol 3

11 #4

Excerpts Vol 2

11 #3

Excerpts Vol 1

11 #2

Excerpts - Index

11 #1

Main Document

#4

(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed February 24, 2022 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due no later than March 24, 2022; the answering brief is due April 21, 2022 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12383593] (JMR) [Entered: 03/01/2022 04:11 PM]

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Received 6 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 34 ] filed by Appellees. [12430174] (SD) [Entered: 04/25/2022 01:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Received 3 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 35 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellee. [12429754] (MLS) [Entered: 04/25/2022 09:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 34 ] submitted by appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The supplemental excerpts of record [ # 35 ] submitted by appellees are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12427848] (KWG) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, III, DOD, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall and Jeffrey Pennington. Date of service: 04/21/2022. [12427805] [22-15286] (Carroll, Sarah) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, III, DOD, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall and Jeffrey Pennington. Date of service: 04/21/2022. [12427800] [22-15286] (Carroll, Sarah) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Received 6 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 27 ] filed by Jeffrey Singer and Todd Zywicki. [12414222] (SD) [Entered: 04/06/2022 02:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND and BRIDGET S. BADE) Order by Judges TASHIMA and FRIEDLAND; Dissent by Judge BADE. Appellants opposed emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 11 ]) is denied. See Winter v. Nat. Res. Def. Council, Inc., 555 U.S. 7, 20 (2008). Appellants request to extend the grant of interim relief, set forth in the reply brief in support of the motion, is denied. The interim stay granted in the March 11, 2022 order is terminated. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. BADE, Circuit Judge, dissenting: I would grant the emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal and, in the absence of an injunction, I would extend interim relief to allow Appellant to seek emergency relief from the Supreme Court. [12411036] (JMR) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 27 ] submitted by Jeffrey Singer and Todd Zywicki is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12411022] (SML) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#30) Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Todd Zywicki and Jeffrey Singer. [12411021] (SML) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Filed (ECF) Appellant Jonathan Dunn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/01/2022. [12410621] [22-15286] (Falk, Donald) [Entered: 04/01/2022 11:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Donald Falk for party(s) Appellant Jonathan Dunn, in case 22-15286. [12384685] (NAC) [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Donald Manwell Falk (Schaerr Jaffe LLP, Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1400, San Francisco, CA 94111) for Appellant Jonathan Dunn. Date of service: 03/02/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12384679] [22-15286] (Falk, Donald) [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Courtney Danielle Enlow in 22-15286 substituted by Attorney Sarah W. Carroll in 22-15286 [12384543] (NAC) [Entered: 03/02/2022 02:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarah Wendy Carroll (U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Division, Appellate Staff, 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Room 7511, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, III, DOD, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall and Jeffrey Pennington. Substitution for Attorney Courtney Danielle Enlow for Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, III, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall, Jeffrey Pennington and DOD. Date of service: 03/02/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12384513] [22-15286] (Carroll, Sarah) [Entered: 03/02/2022 02:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Lowell Sturgill Jr. for party(s) Appellee Frank Kendall Appellee Gregory M. Haynes Appellee Lloyd J. Austin III Appellee Jeffrey Pennington Appellee DOD, in case 22-15286. [12383914] (NAC) [Entered: 03/02/2022 09:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. (U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Room 7241, Washington, D.C. 20005) for Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, III, DOD, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall and Jeffrey Pennington. Date of service: 03/02/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12383869] [22-15286] (Sturgill, Lowell) [Entered: 03/02/2022 08:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed February 24, 2022 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due no later than March 24, 2022; the answering brief is due April 21, 2022 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12383593] (JMR) [Entered: 03/01/2022 04:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Casen Ross for party(s) Appellee Frank Kendall Appellee Gregory M. Haynes Appellee Lloyd J. Austin III Appellee Jeffrey Pennington Appellee DOD, in case 22-15286. [12381862] (NAC) [Entered: 02/28/2022 01:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Casen B. Ross (U.S. Department of Justice - Civil Appellate Staff, 950 Pennsylvania Ave NW Washington, DC 20530) for Appellees Lloyd J. Austin, III, DOD, Gregory M. Haynes, Frank Kendall and Jeffrey Pennington. Date of service: 02/28/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12381853] [22-15286] (Ross, Casen) [Entered: 02/28/2022 01:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [12381470] (RT) [Entered: 02/28/2022 10:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less