This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:58 (UTC).

Jon Doe v. Harlandale Indep School Dist

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Jon Doe filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Harlandale Indep School Dist. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-50654

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JON HARLANDALE-GA DOE

Defendant / Appellee

HARLANDALE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Terry P. Gorman I

Attorney at Gorman Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

901 Mopac Expressway S., 78746

Austin, TX 78733

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Donald Craig Wood

Attorney at Walsh Gallegos Trevino Russo Kyle

1020 N.E. Loop 410

San Antonio, TX 78209

Katie Elizabeth Payne

Attorney at Walsh Gallegos Trevino Russo Kyle

1020 N.E. Loop 410

San Antonio, TX 78209

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Honorable Jon Harlandale-GA Doe [19-50654] (LEF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:48 AM]

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50654] (Terry P. Gorman I) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:03 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Harlandale Independent School District to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 08/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gorman; Attorney for Appellees: Payne, Wood [19-50654] (Katie Elizabeth Payne ) [Entered: 08/27/2019 05:14 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50654] (Katie Elizabeth Payne ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:46 PM]

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document

Attorney Mr. Donald Craig Wood for Appellee Harlandale Independent School District is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [19-50654] (LBM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:29 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/17/2019 for Appellant Jon Harlandale-GA Doe. [19-50654] (CB) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:27 AM]

Open Document #1

Unfiled Extension

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Donald Craig Wood for Harlandale Independent School District for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50654] (Donald Craig Wood ) [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:01 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103349-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50654] (CB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 08:17 AM]

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50654] (Katie Elizabeth Payne ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:45 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Extension Request received from Appellant Mr. Jon Harlandale-GA Doe because it was incorrectly filed as a Appellant's Brief. [19-50654] (MFY) [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER granting Appellee's unopposed motion to view and obtain sealed documents but only for use in this case. [ # 9131479-2 ] [19-50654] (MFY) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Harlandale Independent School District to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 08/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gorman; Attorney for Appellees: Payne, Wood [19-50654] (Katie Elizabeth Payne ) [Entered: 08/27/2019 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Terry P. Gorman I for Appellant Jon Harlandale-GA Doe in 19-50654 [19-50654] (LLL) [Entered: 08/15/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50654] (Terry P. Gorman I) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/17/2019 for Appellant Jon Harlandale-GA Doe. [19-50654] (CB) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50654] (CB) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Katie Elizabeth Payne for party(s) Appellee Harlandale Independent School District, in case 19-50654 [19-50654] (MRW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Donald Craig Wood for Appellee Harlandale Independent School District in 19-50654 [19-50654] (MRW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Mr. Donald Craig Wood for Appellee Harlandale Independent School District is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [19-50654] (LBM) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Donald Craig Wood for Harlandale Independent School District for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50654] (Donald Craig Wood ) [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50654] (Katie Elizabeth Payne ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50654] (Katie Elizabeth Payne ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:18-CV-889. Electronic ROA due on 08/07/2019. [19-50654] (CB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103349-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50654] (CB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Honorable Jon Harlandale-GA Doe [19-50654] (LEF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.