This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/25/2021 at 06:14:07 (UTC).

Johnson v. Reyna, et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Johnson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Reyna,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1371

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JABARI J. JOHNSON

Canon City, CO 81215-0777

Defendant / Appellees

REYNA

WARGO

KORIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Easha Anand

Attorney at Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center

2443 Fillmore Street, Suite 380-15875

San Francisco, CA 94115

Elizabeth Bixby

Attorney at Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center

501 H Street Ne, Suite 275

Washington, DC 20002

David F. Oyer

Attorney at MacArthur Justice Center

501 H Street, Ne, Suite 275

Washington, DC 20002

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Cole Jacob Woodward

Attorney at Colorado Department of Law

1300 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10880695] Miscellaneous pro se correspondence received from Mr. Jabari J. Johnson but not filed. Served on the court 12/07/2021 by US mail. [21-1371] [Entered: 12/20/2021 12:57 PM]

Open Document

[10880376] Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Jabari J. Johnson to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 02/02/2022. Served on: 12/17/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-1371] DFO [Entered: 12/17/2021 01:51 PM]

Open Document #2

Response from court

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10874921] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 11/24/2021. Appellant brief and appendix due on 01/03/2022 for Jabari J. Johnson. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/24/2021 03:09 PM]

Open Document

[10874756] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. Served on 11/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1371] DFO [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:40 AM]

Open Document

[10874754] Notice received from Mr. Jabari J. Johnson that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 11/24/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1371] DFO [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:38 AM]

Open Document

[10873359] Notice that appellant has retained representation received from Mr. Jabari J. Johnson but not filed. Served on 01/12/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/18/2021 12:46 PM]

Open Document

[10872671] Entry of appearance filed by David F. Oyer for Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1371] [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:04 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10870897] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellant's "Motion Requesting an Extension of Time of 30 Days ..." filed by Appellant Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. See attached order for details. Served on 11/09/2021. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/09/2021 08:22 AM]

Open Document

[10870876] "Motion Requesting an Extension of Time of 30 Days to Complete the Signing of Papers for Representation of Attorney Easha Anand as Plaintiff Enters Appearance in this Case Currently Pro-Se ..." filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. Served on 11/04/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/09/2021 07:47 AM]

Open Document

[10870741] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Cole Jacob Woodward for Reyna, Wargo and Korin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/08/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-1371] [Entered: 11/08/2021 03:05 PM]

Open Document

[10870522] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion to extend time to file response. Appellant's response from show cause order is now due on 12/16/2021 for Jabari J. Johnson. Served on 11/08/2021. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/08/2021 10:27 AM]

Open Document

[10870465] Appellant's motion requesting an extension of time to sign documents for representation upon plaintiff's behalf by an attorney for this appeal. filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. Served on 10/31/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/08/2021 08:45 AM]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10880695] Miscellaneous pro se correspondence received from Mr. Jabari J. Johnson but not filed. Served on the court 12/07/2021 by US mail. [21-1371] [Entered: 12/20/2021 12:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket[10880403] Minute order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 02/02/2022 for Jabari J. Johnson No further extensions will be granted under the Clerk's authority. Served on 12/17/2021. Text only entry - no attachment. [21-1371] [Entered: 12/17/2021 02:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10880376] Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Jabari J. Johnson to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 02/02/2022. Served on: 12/17/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-1371] DFO [Entered: 12/17/2021 01:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10878731] Motion providing medical documents received from Mr. Jabari J. Johnson but not filed. Response from the Court attached. Served on 12/13/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1371] [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10874921] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 11/24/2021. Appellant brief and appendix due on 01/03/2022 for Jabari J. Johnson. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/24/2021 03:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket[10874763] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/01/2021 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-1371] [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10874756] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. Served on 11/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1371] DFO [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10874754] Notice received from Mr. Jabari J. Johnson that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 11/24/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1371] DFO [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10873359] Notice that appellant has retained representation received from Mr. Jabari J. Johnson but not filed. Served on 01/12/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/18/2021 12:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10872671] Entry of appearance filed by David F. Oyer for Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1371] [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket[10872252] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 11/12/2021. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/15/2021 01:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10870897] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellant's "Motion Requesting an Extension of Time of 30 Days ..." filed by Appellant Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. See attached order for details. Served on 11/09/2021. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/09/2021 08:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10870876] "Motion Requesting an Extension of Time of 30 Days to Complete the Signing of Papers for Representation of Attorney Easha Anand as Plaintiff Enters Appearance in this Case Currently Pro-Se ..." filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. Served on 11/04/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/09/2021 07:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10870741] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Cole Jacob Woodward for Reyna, Wargo and Korin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/08/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-1371] [Entered: 11/08/2021 03:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docket[10870720] Entry of appearance submitted by Cole J. Woodward for Appellees Korin, Reyna and WargoNone. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/08/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1371] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 11/08/2021 by NA] CJW [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10870522] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion to extend time to file response. Appellant's response from show cause order is now due on 12/16/2021 for Jabari J. Johnson. Served on 11/08/2021. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/08/2021 10:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10870465] Appellant's motion requesting an extension of time to sign documents for representation upon plaintiff's behalf by an attorney for this appeal. filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. Served on 10/31/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/08/2021 08:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10870463] "Motion Notifying the Court that He will Be Pursuing this Appeal in Its Entirety Under the 10/25/2021 Notice of Declaration" received from Mr. Jabari J. Johnson but not filed. [21-1371] [Entered: 11/08/2021 08:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10867607] Order filed by Clerk of the Court to show cause. Briefing on the merits is tolled pending further order of this court. 1915 response due on 11/16/2021 for Jabari J. Johnson. See order for details. Served on 10/26/2021. [21-1371] [Entered: 10/26/2021 10:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10867531] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/26/2021. Notice of appearance due on 11/26/2021 for Jabari J. Johnson, and Notice of appearance due on 11/09/2021 for Korin, Reyna and Wargo. [21-1371] [Entered: 10/26/2021 08:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Korin is a litigant

Latest cases where Wargo is a litigant

Latest cases where Reyna Salmeron, as Preffered P.R. of the Estate of Maria Simon is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cole Jacob Woodward