This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/05/2020 at 06:14:52 (UTC).

Johnson v. Little, et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Johnson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Little. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1362

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DAVID LIGAC

CASADY

COLLINS

CHANCE TURNER

HOFFMAN

BRADLEY VOGAN

TRAVIS ROOT, in their individual and official capacities

VALLE

GILLIS

DEFRANCISCO

THOMAS LITTLE

LYLE MILLER

AYALA

KILPOLITES

LAMBKINS

MCCALLISTER

PAUL AUDET

ANAYA

FOX

Plaintiff / Appellant

JABARI J. JOHNSON

Canon City, CO 81215-0777

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jabari J. Johnson

Attorney at Colorado State Penitentiary (CSP)

P.O. Box 777

Canon City, CO 81215-0777

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10784271] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting Appellant motion to extend time to file response. Fee is due by 12/04/2020 for Jabari J. Johnson. See order for details. Served on 11/06/2020. [20-1362] [Entered: 11/06/2020 11:38 AM]

Open Document

[10783101] Response to show cause order filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. Served on the court 10/26/2020 by US mail. [20-1362] [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:22 PM]

Open Document

[10783099] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson to extend time to file a response until 11/10/2020. Served on the court 10/18/2020 by US mail. [20-1362] [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:19 PM]

Open Document

[10779004] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/13/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-1362] [Entered: 10/16/2020 12:15 PM]

Open Document

[10776464]Order filed by Clerk of the Court to show cause. Response to show cause order due on 10/27/2020 for Jabari J. Johnson. See attached order for details. Served on 10/06/2020. [20-1362] [Entered: 10/06/2020 03:15 PM]

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10784271] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting Appellant motion to extend time to file response. Fee is due by 12/04/2020 for Jabari J. Johnson. See order for details. Served on 11/06/2020. [20-1362] [Entered: 11/06/2020 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10783101] Response to show cause order filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. Served on the court 10/26/2020 by US mail. [20-1362] [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10783099] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson to extend time to file a response until 11/10/2020. Served on the court 10/18/2020 by US mail. [20-1362] [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10779004] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jabari J. Johnson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/13/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-1362] [Entered: 10/16/2020 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket[10776465] District court minute order denying 1915(b) motion. Text-only entry. [20-1362] [Entered: 10/06/2020 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10776464]Order filed by Clerk of the Court to show cause. Response to show cause order due on 10/27/2020 for Jabari J. Johnson. See attached order for details. Served on 10/06/2020. [20-1362] [Entered: 10/06/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10776389] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/06/2020. Notice of appearance due on 11/06/2020 for Jabari J. Johnson. 1915 forms pending in district court. [20-1362] [Entered: 10/06/2020 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCCALLISTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Lambkins is a litigant