This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/03/2022 at 06:12:23 (UTC).

Johnson v. Buns

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Buns. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1002

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Clarence L. Johnson, Jr.

Chicago, IL 60657

Defendant / Appellees

Mayor Pitts Buns, Philadelphia

FBI Pennsylvania

Queen Elizabeth

Joe Biden

United Nations

United States

EPA Canada and United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Clarence L. Johnson Jr.

3150 N. Racine Avenue, #219

Chicago, IL 60657

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Varuni Nelson

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New York

271 Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) PAPERS, security training certificate on behalf of Appellant Johnson, RECEIVED.[3337889] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/24/2022 02:30 PM]

#24

(#24) PAPERS, defective document notice and security training certificate on behalf of Appellant Johnson, RECEIVED.[3332425] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/14/2022 01:11 PM]

#23

(#23) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [22], on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson Jr., copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3329831] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/09/2022 02:03 PM]

#21

(#21) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion for for warrants and indictment, [20], on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr., copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3328893] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/08/2022 11:53 AM]

#19

(#19) PAPERS, Correspondence for the Court, on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr, RECEIVED.[3328874] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/08/2022 11:44 AM]

#18

(#18) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr., copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3320964] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/25/2022 09:29 AM]

#17

(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [13], on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr., copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3320958] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/25/2022 09:25 AM]

#16

(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Oral Argument Statement LR 34.1, [12], on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson Jr., copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3320954] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/25/2022 09:22 AM]

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 05/23/2022, dismissing appeal by 06/13/2022, unless Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr, submits Form D-P, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3319865] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/23/2022 03:37 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER, dated 05/23/2022, dismissing appeal by 06/13/2022, unless Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3319858] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/23/2022 03:33 PM]

#7

(#7) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [6], on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3319333] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/23/2022 08:40 AM]

#5

(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3309174] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:17 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3309166] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:13 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3309159] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:11 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PAPERS, security training certificate on behalf of Appellant Johnson, RECEIVED.[3337889] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/24/2022 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PAPERS, defective document notice and security training certificate on behalf of Appellant Johnson, RECEIVED.[3332425] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/14/2022 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [22], on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson Jr., copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3329831] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/09/2022 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket(#22) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr., FILED. Service date 06/08/2022 by US mail.[3329826] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/09/2022 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion for for warrants and indictment, [20], on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr., copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3328893] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/08/2022 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PAPERS, Correspondence for the Court, on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr, RECEIVED.[3328874] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/08/2022 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docket(#20) MOTION, for warrants and indictment, on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr., FILED. Service date 06/07/2022 by US mail.[3328888] [22-1002] [Entered: 06/08/2022 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr., copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3320964] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/25/2022 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [13], on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr., copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3320958] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/25/2022 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Oral Argument Statement LR 34.1, [12], on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson Jr., copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3320954] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/25/2022 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE, to Appellee Joe Biden, Mayor Pitts Buns, EPA Canada and United States, Queen Elizabeth, FBI Pennsylvania, United Nations and United States , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3319871] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/23/2022 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, dated 05/23/2022, dismissing appeal by 06/13/2022, unless Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr, submits Form D-P, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3319865] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/23/2022 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER, dated 05/23/2022, dismissing appeal by 06/13/2022, unless Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3319858] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/23/2022 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [6], on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[3319333] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/23/2022 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#6) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr., FILED. Service date 05/20/2022 by US mail.[3319330] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/23/2022 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3309174] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3309168] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3309166] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3309159] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Clarence L. Johnson, Jr., FILED. [3309149] [22-1002] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Nations is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Varuni Nelson