This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2021 at 06:10:40 (UTC).

Johnny Pour v. Wells Fargo Bank, et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Johnny Pour filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15528

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHNNY POUR

San Leandro, CA 94578

Defendant / Appellees

E. BARAN

WELLS FARGO BANK, AKA Wells Fargo Merchant Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Johnny Pour

16611 E14Th St.

San Leandro, CA 94578

Tiega Noel Varlack

Attorney at Varlack Legal Services

225 W. Winton Avenue, Suite 207

Hayward, CA 94544

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Alicia A. Baiardo

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jenny Yi

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 05/26/2021. See order for details. [12110339] (VS) [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:34 AM]

#10

(#10) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): A dial-in telephone conference, with appellees counsel, will be held on May 12, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. [12101939] (WL) [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:30 PM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellant, 05/10/2021, 12:30 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12101549] (VS) [Entered: 05/04/2021 12:47 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Date: May 4, 2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant on the attached list will receive an email with dial-in information. If there are any changes or additions to the list, please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. Also, please notify Circuit Mediator Robert S. Kaiser immediately by email (robert_kaiser@ca9.uscourts.gov) if a participant has an unavoidable scheduling conflict. Please copy all participants on any such communications. All emails should include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. All written or spoken communication with the mediator, including the discussions during the scheduled conference, are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. Additional information about confidentiality (including a copy of Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1), the assessment conference, and the Mediation Program are attached and can also be found at the Mediation Program website (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [12078575] (WL) [Entered: 04/19/2021 09:49 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33- 1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in that pilot project. By April 16, 2021, the parties are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator in writing whether the issues on appeal or in the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement discussions. The written response to this order and all future written or spoken communication with the mediator are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator Robert Kaiser by email (robert_kaiser@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Robert Kaiser, Circuit Mediator, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12062539] (WL) [Entered: 04/02/2021 04:07 PM]

3 #2

Certificate of Electronic Filing

3 #1

Mediation Questionnaire

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Main Document

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 05/26/2021. See order for details. [12110339] (VS) [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): A dial-in telephone conference, with appellees counsel, will be held on May 12, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. [12101939] (WL) [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellant, 05/10/2021, 12:30 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12101549] (VS) [Entered: 05/04/2021 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Tiega Noel Varlack for party(s) Appellant Johnny Pour, in case 21-15528. [12097551] (RR) [Entered: 04/29/2021 07:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tiega-Noel Varlack (Varlack Legal Services, 225 W. Winton Ave., Suite 207, Hayward, CA 94544) for Appellant Johnny Pour. Date of service: 04/29/2021. (Party was previously proceeding pro se.) [12097230] [21-15528] (Varlack, Tiega) [Entered: 04/29/2021 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Date: May 4, 2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant on the attached list will receive an email with dial-in information. If there are any changes or additions to the list, please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. Also, please notify Circuit Mediator Robert S. Kaiser immediately by email (robert_kaiser@ca9.uscourts.gov) if a participant has an unavoidable scheduling conflict. Please copy all participants on any such communications. All emails should include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. All written or spoken communication with the mediator, including the discussions during the scheduled conference, are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. Additional information about confidentiality (including a copy of Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1), the assessment conference, and the Mediation Program are attached and can also be found at the Mediation Program website (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [12078575] (WL) [Entered: 04/19/2021 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33- 1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in that pilot project. By April 16, 2021, the parties are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator in writing whether the issues on appeal or in the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement discussions. The written response to this order and all future written or spoken communication with the mediator are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator Robert Kaiser by email (robert_kaiser@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Robert Kaiser, Circuit Mediator, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12062539] (WL) [Entered: 04/02/2021 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/30/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12058898]. [21-15528] (AD) [Entered: 03/30/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/30/2021. [12058322] [21-15528] (Yi, Jenny) [Entered: 03/30/2021 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12053945] (CKP) [Entered: 03/26/2021 01:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Johnny Pour opening brief due 05/26/2021. Appellees E. Baran and Wells Fargo Bank answering brief due 06/28/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12051847] (RT) [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia Anne Baiardo